Arnold #253905 v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Frank John Arnold
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2015cv00828
Filed: May 6, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's 49 [Second Amended Motion] to Alter or Amend Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the petitioner's [Second Amended] Application for Certificate of Appealability (part of Doc. 49 ) is denied and that a Certificate o f Appealability shall not issue because the petitioner has not shown that jurists of reason would find it debatable whether his Rule 59(e) motion states a valid claim of the denial of a constitutional right or that jurists of reason would find it debatable whether the Court is correct in its procedural ruling. FURTHER ORDERED that the petitioner's [Second Amended Motion for] Appointment of Counsel (part of Doc. 49 ) is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall provide the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this Order to be filed in No. 17-16106. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/5/2017. (ATD)
April 5, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 38 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. The petitioner's First Amended Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 8 ) is denied and that this action is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability shall not issue and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied because the petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right and because dismissal o f the petition is justified by a plain procedural bar and jurists of reason would not find the procedural ruling debatable. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING 40 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Frank John Arnold. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 04/05/2017. (KAS)
July 28, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending 8 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Frank John Arnold be denied and dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that a Certificate of Appealability and leave to proce ed in forma pauperis on appeal be DENIED because Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right and because the dismissal of the Petition is justified by a plain procedural bar and jurists of reason would not find the procedural ruling debatable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 7/27/16. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold #253905 v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank John Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Adele Ponce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Represented By: Adele Ponce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?