Patrick LaCross et al v. Knight Transportation Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Patrick LaCross, Robert Lira and Matthew Lofton
Defendant: Knight Transportation Incorporated, Knight Truck and Trailer Sales LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2015cv00990
Filed: June 1, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2017 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: denying Plaintiffs' Motion 151 to Certify This Court's September 22, 2016, and October 18, 2016, Orders Granting Knight's Motion to Compel Arbitration for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/26/17.(REW)
October 18, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's September 22, 2016 Order (Doc. 149 ). (See attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/18/16.(JAMA) Modified on 10/18/2016 to add Opinion (WO)(JAMA).
September 22, 2016 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: granting Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action 111 and compelling arbitration of the arbitrability of Plaintiffs' claims; staying these proceedings pending a decision on arbitrability by the arbitrator; the parties shall file a joint status report within one week of the arbitrator's decision on arbitrability or by 1/6/17, whichever is sooner(see order for complete details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/22/16.(REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick LaCross et al v. Knight Transportation Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation Incorporated
Represented By: James E Hart
Represented By: Carly M Nese
Represented By: Richard H Rahm
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Whiteside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Truck and Trailer Sales LLC
Represented By: James E Hart
Represented By: Carly M Nese
Represented By: Richard H Rahm
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Whiteside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick LaCross
Represented By: Todd H Harrison
Represented By: Christina Ann Humphrey
Represented By: Leslie H Joyner
Represented By: Brennan S Kahn
Represented By: Stanley D Saltzman
Represented By: Ellen R Serbin
Represented By: James M Trush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lira
Represented By: Todd H Harrison
Represented By: Christina Ann Humphrey
Represented By: Leslie H Joyner
Represented By: Brennan S Kahn
Represented By: Stanley D Saltzman
Represented By: Ellen R Serbin
Represented By: James M Trush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lofton
Represented By: Todd H Harrison
Represented By: Christina Ann Humphrey
Represented By: Leslie H Joyner
Represented By: Brennan S Kahn
Represented By: Stanley D Saltzman
Represented By: Ellen R Serbin
Represented By: James M Trush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?