Valenzuela et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al

Plaintiff: Alonzo Valenzuela, Maria Valenzuela, Scott Hurst, Socorro Munoz, Brenda Peters and Betty Hanson
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, SFPP LP, Kinder Morgan Operating LP D and Kinder Morgan GP Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2015cv01092
Filed: June 15, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2017 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 259 Motion to Stay; denying 208 Motion to Certify Class. Status conference set for 2/24/2017 is VACATED and reset to 3/22/2017 at 3:00 p.m. Plaintiffs to file 12-page memorandum addressing issues in this order by 3/3/2017; defend ants to file 12-page respond by 3/10/2017. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate a telephone dial-in call for the status conference reset to 3/22/2017 at 3:00 p.m. and provide the Court with the dial-in information no later than 3/21/2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/21/2017.(DGC, nvo)
December 21, 2016 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re privileged document review. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/21/2016. (DGC, nvo)
July 11, 2016 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 117 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/11/2016. (DGC, nvo)
May 27, 2016 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 117 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims; denying 117 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting 127 Motion for Leave to File. The requests for discovery at issue in the discovery disputes discussed on 5/25/2016 are denied. A te lephonic status conference shall be held with the parties on 8/5/2016 at 3:30 PM before the Honorable David G. Campbell, 401 West Washington Street, Courtroom 603, Phoenix, AZ 85003. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall set up a dial-in line for all parties and court to participate in the status conference. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/27/2016.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valenzuela et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Valenzuela
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Honecker
Represented By: Ethan M Lange
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gepford McCulley
Represented By: Norman E Siegel
Represented By: Thomas S Stewart
Represented By: Barrett J Vahle
Represented By: Steven M Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Valenzuela
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Honecker
Represented By: Ethan M Lange
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gepford McCulley
Represented By: Norman E Siegel
Represented By: Thomas S Stewart
Represented By: Barrett J Vahle
Represented By: Steven M Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hurst
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Honecker
Represented By: Ethan M Lange
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gepford McCulley
Represented By: Norman E Siegel
Represented By: Thomas S Stewart
Represented By: Barrett J Vahle
Represented By: Steven M Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Socorro Munoz
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Honecker
Represented By: Ethan M Lange
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gepford McCulley
Represented By: Norman E Siegel
Represented By: Thomas S Stewart
Represented By: Barrett J Vahle
Represented By: Steven M Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Peters
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Honecker
Represented By: Ethan M Lange
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gepford McCulley
Represented By: Norman E Siegel
Represented By: Thomas S Stewart
Represented By: Barrett J Vahle
Represented By: Steven M Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Hanson
Represented By: Jason S Hartley
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Honecker
Represented By: Ethan M Lange
Represented By: Elizabeth A Gepford McCulley
Represented By: Norman E Siegel
Represented By: Thomas S Stewart
Represented By: Barrett J Vahle
Represented By: Steven M Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: M Ray Hartman
Represented By: Catherine Joseph OConnor
Represented By: Steven Marc Strauss
Represented By: Summer J Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFPP LP
Represented By: M Ray Hartman
Represented By: Catherine Joseph OConnor
Represented By: Steven Marc Strauss
Represented By: Summer J Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan Operating LP D
Represented By: M Ray Hartman
Represented By: Catherine Joseph OConnor
Represented By: Steven Marc Strauss
Represented By: Summer J Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan GP Incorporated
Represented By: M Ray Hartman
Represented By: Catherine Joseph OConnor
Represented By: Steven Marc Strauss
Represented By: Summer J Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?