Craten et al v. Foster Poultry Farms Incorporated

Plaintiff: James Craten and Amanda Craten
Defendant: Foster Poultry Farms Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2015cv02587
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2018 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Foster Poultry Farms' 275 Pretrial Motion for Judgment as Matter of Law Regarding Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claim. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/13/2018. (MMO)
January 19, 2018 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is granted in favor of Foster Farms on Counts I, II, and III of the Amended Complaint. Summary judgment is denied on Counts IV and V to the extent those claims are based on duties that parallel the requirements imposed upon poultry processors by the PPIA. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/19/2018. (MMO)
June 24, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part as explained herein 30 Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses One, Seven and Eight. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 33 Motion for Judicial Notice. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/24/2016. (MMO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craten et al v. Foster Poultry Farms Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Poultry Farms Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Craten
Represented By: Brendan J Flaherty
Represented By: Elliot L Olsen
Represented By: Fred H Pritzker
Represented By: Brian Adam Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Craten
Represented By: Brendan J Flaherty
Represented By: Elliot L Olsen
Represented By: Fred H Pritzker
Represented By: Brian Adam Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?