Bridgepoint Construction Services Incorporated et al v. Lassetter et al

Plaintiff: Bridgepoint Construction Services Incorporated and Norm Salter
Defendant: James Lassetter and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2016cv00078
Filed: January 13, 2016
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to FileSecond Amended Complaint 45 . Plaintiffs shall file the Second Amended Complaint on the docket by May 22, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendant's Motion to Stay 55 . Signed by Judge John J. Tuchi on 5/17/17. (CLB)
January 26, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file an Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/25/17.(LSP)
July 19, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Count II of Plaintiffs' Complaint is dismissed with prejudice, and Plaintiffs may amend Counts I, III, and IV. Plaintiffs must file any Amended Complaint by August 2, 2016. If Plaintiffs fail to timely file an Amended Complaint, the Clerk shall dismiss this action without further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/19/16.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgepoint Construction Services Incorporated et al v. Lassetter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgepoint Construction Services Incorporated
Represented By: Robert G Klein
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norm Salter
Represented By: Robert G Klein
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lassetter
Represented By: Jennifer Joan Axel
Represented By: Eric Edward Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?