Sebert v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Asia Lynn Sebert
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections, Corizon Health Incorporated, Corizon Incorporated, Corizon LLC, Corizon Health of New Jersey LLC, Caron Grant, Unknown Grant, Anthony M Villavicencio, Unknown Villavicencio, Unknown Parties, Arizona, State of, Charles L Ryan, Unknown Ryan, Christopher Moody, Unknown Moody, James O'Neil, Unknown O'Neil and Wexford Health Sources Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2016cv00354
Filed: February 6, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Presiding Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 125 is ADOPTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. The Motion for Extension of Time 126 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/16/2017. (REK)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER (Service Packet): The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 103 ) is ADOPTED. Defendants Corizon LLC and Corizon Health of New Jersey, LLC, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Motion to Quash Service (Doc. 95 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff has sixty da ys from the date of this Order to complete service on Defendants Moody and ONeil. The Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiff service packets for Defendants Moody and ONeil. Plaintiff shall complete and return the service packets within ten days of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/03/2017. (REK)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Court grant Putative Defendants' Moody and ONeil's Motion to Quash Service (Doc. 95 ); that the Court direct the Clerk of Court to mail Plaintiff a copy of this Order and service pac kets for Defendants Moody and O'Neil; that the Court order Plaintiff to complete and return the service packets to the Clerk of Court within ten (10) days of the date of filing of the Court's Order; that the Court grant Plaintiff an addi tional sixty (60) days from the date of the filing of its Order to complete service of the summons and Second Amended Complaint on Defendants Moody and O'Neil; that the Court find that Plaintiff has responded to the Order to show cause (Doc. 94 ) and that the Court in its discretion not dismiss the action as to Defendants Moody and ONeil for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute; that the Court dismiss without prejudice Defendants Corizon LLC and Corizon Health of New Jersey, LLC from this action; that the Court make the following orders: (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 11/15/2016. (REK)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 28 Motion to Strike. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge on the following fully briefed dispositive motions: State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 13 ); Defendant Villavicencio's Motion to Dismiss and Joinder with the State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 14 ); and Defendants Wexford Health Sources, Inc. and Caron Grant-Ellis' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 17 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 6/17/16.(LSP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sebert v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Represented By: Lisa Marie Hemann
Represented By: Neil Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph Scott Conlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph Scott Conlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon LLC
Represented By: Joseph Scott Conlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health of New Jersey LLC
Represented By: Joseph Scott Conlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caron Grant
Represented By: Brandi Christine Blair
Represented By: Jonah Eric Rappazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony M Villavicencio
Represented By: Barry Matthew Markson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Villavicencio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Neil Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Neil Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Incorporated
Represented By: Brandi Christine Blair
Represented By: Jonah Eric Rappazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asia Lynn Sebert
Represented By: Delano Mackey Phillips
Represented By: Anthony G Salvador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?