Julian v. Swift Transportation Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Julian
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company Incorporated and Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00576
Filed: March 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting 282 Motion for Approval of Settlement. ORDERED granting in part 283 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs' counsel are entitled to 25% of the Gross Settlement Amount plus reimbursement of actual out of pocket costs of $308,153.88. ORDERED granting in part 284 Motion for Service. Plaintiff Pamela Julian is entitled to a service award of $15,000 out of the Gross Settlement Amount. FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of Court shall enter a judgment of dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/13/20. (EJA)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER re: 278 Report - Status: IT IS ORDERED no later than September 18, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file their motion for approval of the settlement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motions in Limine (Doc. 263 , 266 , 268 , 269 , 273 ) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/31/2020. (CLB)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER denying 222 Motion to Require Plaintiffs Provide Travel Plan ; granting 223 Motion for Award of Damages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED a status conference is set for January 14, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED no later than January 7, 2020, the parties shall file a joint status report listing the matters to be resolved at trial, the expected number of witnesses each side wishes to call, and the anticipated length of trial. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/27/19. (CLB)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER denying 221 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED no later than January 10, 2020, the parties shall file a joint status report indicating the weeks both sides are available for trial from February 2020 through July 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/10/19. (CLB)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 213 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Stipulation to Request Re-Setting Pretrial Schedule 219 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the deadline for submission of pretrial documents i s VACATED to be reset by later order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED no later than June 10, 2019, Swift shall file its motion regarding interlocutory appeal. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition no later than June 17, 2019, and Swift shall file its reply no later than June 24, 2019. See attachment for further details and deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/30/19. (CLB)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER the Motion for Summary Judgment 157 and Motion for Extension of Time 190 are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motion for Summary Judgment 159 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED no later than January 18, 2019, if Plaintiffs believe there are no genuine disputes of material fact regarding the first day of orientation and time spent studying, Plaintiffs shall file a motion for summary judgment addressing those two issues. The response and reply shall be submitted as required by Local Rule 56.1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED no later than February 1, 2019, the parties shall submit a joint statement addressing the other issues remaining in this suit. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/28/18. (CLB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julian v. Swift Transportation Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Julian
Represented By: Gary W Aber
Represented By: Joshua G Konecky
Represented By: Nathan B Piller
Represented By: Garrett Webster Wotkyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company of Arizona LLC
Represented By: David T Barton
Represented By: Catherine Christine Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?