CWT Canada II LP et al v. Danzik et al
Plaintiff: CWT Canada II LP and Resource Recovery Corporation
Defendant: Elizabeth J Danzik and Deja II LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00607
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER: CWT's motion for summary judgment 156 is granted as to Ker's defamation counter claims and denied in all other respects. Ker and Carrigan's motion for summary judgment 165 is denied. Elizabeth's motion for summary judgm ent 165 is granted as to the claim for constructive trust and denied as to the accounting claim. Ker and Carrigan's motion to strike 175 is granted. The Court has set a telephonic hearing on January 25, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. The purpose of the hearing is to set a firm trial date and a final pretrial conference date. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/02/2019. (REK)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying 128 Motion to Strike; denying 128 Motion to Quash; denying 128 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/8/2018.(DGC, nvo)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER: The motion to dismiss Tony Ker's original counterclaim (Doc. 86 in CV16-2577) is denied as moot. The motion to dismiss Tony Ker's second amended counterclaim, filed by CWT Canada II Limited Partnership and Research Recovery Corporati on (Doc. 107 in CV16-0607), is granted with respect to the abuse of process claim and denied with respect to the defamation claim. The motion to dismiss the amended complaint filed by Brian Appel (Doc. 64 in CV17-0969) is granted. The motion for ju dicial notice filed by CWT Canada II Limited Partnership, Research Recovery Corporation, Jean Noelting, and Bruce MacFarlane (Doc. 62 in CV17-0969) is granted. The motion to dismiss the amended complaint filed by CWT Canada II Limited Partnership, Research Recovery Corporation, Jean Noelting, and Bruce MacFarlane (Doc. 59 in CV17-0969) is granted. The Clerk is directed to terminate Case No. CV-17-0969-PHX-DGC). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/26/2018. (REK)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying 72 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/24/2017.(DGC, nvo)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying (54) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:16-cv-00607-DGC. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/29/2016. (Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00607-DGC, 2:16-cv-02577-GMS) (ATD)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 34 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Deja II, LLC and denied as moot as to Defendant Elizabeth J. Danzik. DEFAULT JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendant Deja II, LLC in the amount of $999,975.00, $332,324.50 in pre-judgment interest through July 22, 2016, and post-judgment interest pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/16. (DXD)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting the 33 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/06/2016. (ATD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CWT Canada II LP et al v. Danzik et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CWT Canada II LP
Represented By: Jeffrey Morton Eilender
Represented By: Bradley J Nash
Represented By: Vitali S Rosenfeld
Represented By: James Hendrik Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resource Recovery Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Morton Eilender
Represented By: Bradley J Nash
Represented By: Vitali S Rosenfeld
Represented By: James Hendrik Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth J Danzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deja II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?