Arizona Libertarian Party et al v. Reagan

Plaintiff: Arizona Libertarian Party and Michael Kielsky
Defendant: Michele Reagan
Case Number: 2:2016cv01019
Filed: April 12, 2016
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 69 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with this order and terminate this matter. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/7/17.(DXD)
July 20, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/20/2016.(DGC, nvo)
May 27, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for TRO; denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. On or before 6/10/2016, the parties shall jointly file a memorandum setting forth their views of how the remainder of the case should proceed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/27/2016.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona Libertarian Party et al v. Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Libertarian Party
Represented By: Oliver B Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kielsky
Represented By: Oliver B Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Reagan
Represented By: James P Driscoll-MacEachron
Represented By: Kara Karlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?