AMA Multimedia LLC v. Sagan Limited et al
Plaintiff: AMA Multimedia LLC
Defendant: Sagan Limited, MXN Limited a Barbados company, individually and doing business as Porn.com, David Koonar, Cyberweb Limited formerly MXN LTD., a Barbados Company, individually and doing business as Porn.com, Sagan Limited a Republic of Seychelles company, individually and doing business as Porn.com, Unknown Parties, Netmedia Services Incorporated a Canadian company, individually and doing business as Porn.com and GLP 5 Incorporated a Michigan company, individually and doing business as Trafficforce.com
Case Number: 2:2016cv01269
Filed: April 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 191 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Cyberweb Limited, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited . (Van Loon, Erica)
October 16, 2020 Filing 190 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by AMA Multimedia LLC . (Manolio, Veronica)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Koonar's motion to dismiss (Doc. #49 ) is denied. 2. Defendants' motion to seal (Doc. #188 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to accept for filing under seal the document lodged on the Court's docket at Doc. #124 . AMA is ordered to file a redacted version of the Supplemental Memorandum and Exhibit A in the public docket within seven days of this order. (See document for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/9/20. (SLQ)
October 9, 2020 Filing 124 *SEALED Defendants' Supplemental Briefing Re Personal Jurisdiction re: #123 Stipulation. Filed by Cyberweb Limited, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erica J. Van Loon, #2 Affidavit of Philip Bradbury, #3 Exhibit A-D to Bradbury Declaration, #4 Affidavit of David Koonar, #5 Exhibit A-C to Koonar Declaration, #6 Affidavit of Kristen Richardson, #7 Exhibit A-B to Richardson Declaration, #8 Exhibit C-E to Richardson Declaration, #9 Exhibit F (Part 1) to Richardson Declaration, #10 Exhibit F (Part 2) to Richardson Declaration, #11 Exhibit F (Part 3) to Richardson Declaration, #12 Exhibit G to Richardson Declaration)(Van Loon, Erica) *Modified on 1/26/2017 (DXD). Modified to change from lodged to filed per order #189 ; NEF regenerated on 10/9/2020 (SLQ)/(SCH).
September 10, 2020 Filing 188 MOTION to Seal Document #186 Memorandum by Cyberweb Limited, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
September 8, 2020 Filing 187 NOTICE of Errata re: #186 Memorandum Plaintiff's Notice of Errata Re Its Supplemental Memorandum by Plaintiff AMA Multimedia LLC.. (Manolio, Veronica)
September 4, 2020 Filing 186 MEMORANDUM Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Personal Jurisdiction Over David Koonar #124 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document by Plaintiff AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Supplemental Memorandum)(Manolio, Veronica)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 SECOND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 6/25/2021. Dispositive motions due by 10/29/2021. The claims against GLP 5 are dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. Doc. 184 at 2. The motions to dismiss by Defendants Cyberweb and Netmedia (Doc. #27 , #70 ) are withdrawn. Id. The Court will rule on the motion to dismiss by Defendant Koonar (Docs. #49 , #67 , #75 , #117 , #124 ). In light of the factual material submitted by Koonar with the last brief (Doc. #124 ), Plaintiff may file a memorandum, not to exceed five pages, by 9/4/2020. No further briefing will be permitted.See attachment for further details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/2020. (CLB)
August 17, 2020 Filing 184 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER - The Court will not dismiss this case on the basis of the forum selection clause as requested by Defendants. The parties shall, within 21 days of this order, jointly propose a revised schedule for completing this case under the Case Management Order (Doc. #58 ). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/27/20. (DXD)
July 22, 2020 Filing 182 RESPONSE re: 181 Order Joint Submission of Briefs from Most Recent Ninth Circuit Appeal by Defendants Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Van Loon, Erica)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER. As the Court works its way through the issues on remand, based on the existing briefs (Doc. 180), it has concluded that the briefs filed by the parties in the most recent appeal would be helpful. The parties jointly shall file those briefs in this docket by July 24, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7-21-20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties' joint memorandum on next steps in this case. Doc.179. Both parties agree that an evidentiary hearing is unnecessary. Id. at 3, 6. The parties also largely agree on the issues that remain for resolution on Defendants' motions to dismiss. Id. at 2, 5-6. Plaintiffs assert that no further briefing is necessary, and suggest that the Court can resolve the remaining issues by reviewing existing briefing. Id. at 2-4. Defendants suggest that the parties file 20-page supplemental memoranda, with a 10-page reply. Id. at 6. The Court agrees with Plaintiff, at least initially. The Court will address the remaining motion to dismiss issues on the basis of the existing briefs. If the Court concludes in the process that additional focused briefing is needed on a specific issue or two, it will order such briefing. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 6-12-20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
June 5, 2020 Filing 179 MEMORANDUM Joint Memorandum Following Ninth Circuit Court of Appeal's Second Remand by Plaintiff AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER. The Ninth Circuit has reversed the Court's dismissal of this action, and the mandate has issued. By June 5, 2020, the parties shall file a joint memorandum setting forth their views on how this case should now proceed and what issues remain to be resolved. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 5-21-20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
May 19, 2020 Filing 177 MANDATE of USCA (18-17117) reversing and remanding re: #172 Notice of Appeal filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(LAD)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER denying without prejudice #174 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/9/2018.(DGC, nvo)
November 7, 2018 Filing 174 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Cyberweb Limited, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Erica J. Van Loon, #3 Exhibit A to Van Loon Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Van Loon Declaration, #5 Declaration of Ivan Alert, #6 Exhibit 1 to Alert Declaration, #7 Exhibit 2 to Alert Declaration, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
October 31, 2018 Filing 173 USCA Case Number re: #172 Notice of Appeal. Case number 18-17117, Ninth Circuit. (EJA)
October 26, 2018 Filing 172 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #171 Order Dismissing Case by AMA Multimedia LLC. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-16125969. (Manolio, Veronica)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER - The renewed Motion to Dismiss based on forum non conveniens filed by Defendants Sagan Limited, Cyberweb Ltd., Netmedia Services Inc., and David Koonar (Doc. #154 ) is granted. The claims asserted against Defendant GLP 5, Inc. are dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction (see Docs. #64 at 7-8, 126 at n.1). The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/24/18. (DXD)
October 23, 2018 Filing 170 SEALED EXHIBITS 2 & 5 re: #157 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Forum Non Conveniens by AMA Multimedia LLC. (ATD)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #165 Motion to Seal Exhibits 2 and 5 to the supplemental memorandum in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff is reminded that unless already having done so, it must file a redacted version of all exhibits to the supplemental memorandum in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to forum non conveniens on the public docket. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/22/2018. (ATD)
October 22, 2018 Filing 168 NOTICE re: Notice of Filing Redacted Version of Exhibits to the Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Forum Non Conveniens by AMA Multimedia LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Manolio, Veronica)
October 22, 2018 Filing 167 NOTICE re: Notice of Lodging Under Seal Exhibits 2 and 5 to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by AMA Multimedia LLC re: #166 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document . (Manolio, Veronica)
October 22, 2018 Filing 166 ***FILED in at (Doc. #170 )***SEALED LODGED Proposed proposed sealed exhibits 2 and 5 to Plaintiffs Supplemental Memorandum (Doc 157) re: #165 MOTION to Seal Document Revised Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 2 and 5 to the Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Forum Non Conveniens. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica) Modified on 10/23/2018 (ATD).
October 22, 2018 Filing 165 MOTION to Seal Document Revised Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 2 and 5 to the Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Forum Non Conveniens by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER denying #156 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/2018.(DGC, nvo)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #162 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Paul Basileo is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Defendants and the Clerk shall remove him from receiving electronic court notices in this matter. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/24/18. (DXD)
September 24, 2018 Filing 162 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel (with Client Approval) by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Basileo, Steven) *Modified motion type on 9/25/2018 (DXD).
September 21, 2018 Filing 161 REPLY re: #154 Memorandum Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens by Defendants Cyberweb Limited, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Van Loon, Erica)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re: forum non conveniens. Reply due 9/21/2018. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/12/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo)
September 5, 2018 Filing 159 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #154 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens by Cyberweb Limited, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica) *Modified linkage on 9/6/2018 (DXD).
September 5, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Erica J Van Loon. (Van Loon, Erica)
August 31, 2018 Filing 157 *SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO #70 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FORUM NON CONVENIENS by AMA Multimedia LLC. (: SEALED Attachments (Not Filed): #1 Exhibit) (Manolio, Veronica) *Modified to reflect Motion to Seal Exhibits Denied by Order #164 on 10/18/2018 (SCH). *Modified to File on the Public Docket Main Document Pursuant to DGC Chambers on 10/24/2018 (MAP).
August 31, 2018 Filing 156 MOTION to Seal Document PLAINTIFF AMA MULTIMEDIA, LLCS MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS 2 AND 5 TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FORUM NON CONVENIENS by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
August 6, 2018 Filing 155 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #154 Memorandum filed by David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Cyberweb Limited, Sagan Limited. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
August 3, 2018 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens Pursuant to the Court's 153 Order by Defendants Cyberweb Limited, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Van Loon, Erica)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER. The Court has reviewed the parties' joint memorandum. Doc. #152 . The Ninth Circuit's ruling did not foreclose Defendants' arguments that (1) they may assert the forum selection clause in the CPRA because they are closely-related parties under the Manetti-Farrow case, (2) they are agents of a signatory, (3) they are third-party beneficiaries of the CPRA, and (4) they are implied licensees under the CPRA. The court of appeals found Defendants' evidence of (5) assignment of the CPRA insufficient, but did not rule that the assignment argument was entirely foreclosed. The Court concludes that issues (1)-(5) should be the subject of additional briefing. With more than 30 briefs having been filed on these and related issues before the appeal, the Court would have great difficulty isolating the various arguments previously made by the parties. Therefore, Defendants shall file a 20-page memorandum on these five issues by August 3, 2018; Plaintiff shall file a 20-page response by August 31, 2018; Defendants shall file a 10-page reply by September 14, 2018. The Court will not foreclose Defendants from presenting additional evidence on the assignment issue, and Plaintiff can respond to that evidence with evidence of its own or, in effect, with a Rule 56(d)-type response. No motions to strike or sur-replies will be filed, and the parties are reminded of the professionalism required before the Court as mentioned in previous orders. If the Court denies the motion to dismiss after reviewing this additional briefing, it will set another case management conference to address remaining issues in the case. Defendants have indicated that they believe the Court should forego ruling on personal jurisdiction issues. Doc. 152 at 6. The parties are reminded of the briefing requirements in LRCiv 7.1(b)(1), and legal citations in briefs should be set forth in the text as opposed to footnotes. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7-6-18. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
June 29, 2018 Filing 152 MEMORANDUM Following Ninth Circuit Court of Appeal's Remand by Plaintiff AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties' joint memorandum shall be due by 6/29/2018. The Court will not grant further extension to this deadline. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/30/2018.(DGC, nvo)
May 25, 2018 Filing 150 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Memorandum by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER re: #147 USCA Mandate. The parties shall jointly file a memorandum indicating to the Court what the parties believe the best course of action should be in this case in light of the Ninth Circuit's remand. The joint memorandum shall be filed on or before 6/8/2018. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/24/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo)
May 22, 2018 Filing 148 Additional Attachments to Main Document - Order of the USCA that the parties shall bear their own costs re: #147 USCA Mandate. (LAD)
May 22, 2018 Filing 147 MANDATE of USCA (17-15178) vacating and remanding for further proceedings re: #128 Notice of Appeal filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(LAD)
April 24, 2017 Filing 145 Sealed Exhibit A and C to #133 Van Loon Declaration by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C to Van Loon Declaration)(MAP)
April 24, 2017 Filing 144 Sealed Supplemental Briefing Re Personal Jurisdiction by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Exhibits A, C, D to BradburyDeclaration, #2 Unredacted Exhibit C to Koonar Declaration, #3 Unredatced Declaration of Kristen Richardson, #4 Unredacted Exhibits A-B to Richardson Declaration, #5 Unredacted Exhibits C-E to Richardson Declaration, #6 Unredacted Exhibit F (part 1) to Richardson Declaration, #7 Unredacted Exhibit F (part 2) to Richardson Declaration)(MAP)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #131 , #134 Motions to Seal. The Clerk of Court shall accept for filing under seal the documents lodged under seal on the Court's docket as Docs. #132 , #135 , #136 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/24/17. (MAP)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying #133 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/24/2017.(DGC, nvo)
March 8, 2017 Filing 141 *SURREPLY re: #140 Reply to Response to #133 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by Plaintiff AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica) *Modified event type/linkage on 3/9/2017 (DXD).
March 6, 2017 Filing 140 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #133 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erica J. Van Loon)(Van Loon, Erica)
February 27, 2017 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #133 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Manolio, Veronica)
February 23, 2017 Filing 138 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #131 MOTION to Seal Document #124 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erica J. Van Loon, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
February 16, 2017 Filing 137 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #131 MOTION to Seal Document #124 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
February 9, 2017 Filing 136 *FILED at Doc. #145 *SEALED LODGED Proposed Ex. C to Van Loon Decl., Under Seal re: #134 MOTION to Seal Document #133 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Van Loon, Erica) *Modified on 4/24/2017 (MAP)*.
February 9, 2017 Filing 135 *FILED at Doc. #145 *SEALED LODGED Proposed Ex. A to Van Loon Decl., Under Seal re: #134 MOTION to Seal Document #133 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Van Loon, Erica) *Modified on 4/24/2017 (MAP)*.
February 9, 2017 Filing 134 MOTION to Seal Document #133 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
February 9, 2017 Filing 133 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Erica Van Loon, #3 Exhibit A to Van Loon Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Van Loon Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Van Loon Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Van Loon Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
January 31, 2017 Filing 132 *FILED at Doc. #144 *SEALED LODGED Proposed documents relating to Defendants' Supplemntal Briefing re Personal Jurisdiction re: #131 MOTION to Seal Document #124 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Exhibits A, C, D to Bradbury Declaration, #2 Unredacted Exhibit C to Koonar Declaration, #3 Unredacted Declaration of Kristen Richardson, #4 Unredacted Exhibits A-B to Richardson Declaration, #5 Unredacted Exhibits C-E to Richardson Declaration, #6 Unredacted Exhibit F(part 1) to Richardson Declaratio, #7 Unredacted Exhibit F(part 2) to Richardson Declaratio)(Van Loon, Erica) *Modified on 4/24/2017 (MAP)*.
January 31, 2017 Filing 131 MOTION to Seal Document #124 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Defendants' Supplemental Briefing re Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Declaration of Erica Van Loon, #3 Declaration of Philip Bradbury, #4 Redacted Exhibits A-D to Bradbury Declaration, #5 Declaration of David Koonar, #6 Redacted Exhibits A-C to Koonar Declaration, #7 Redacted Declaration of Kristen Richardson, #8 Redacted Exhibits A-G to Richardson Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
January 31, 2017 Filing 130 USCA Case Number re: #128 Notice of Appeal, Ninth Circuit Case number 17-15178. (LSP)
January 27, 2017 Filing 129 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT by AMA Multimedia LLC re: #128 Notice of Appeal. (Manolio, Veronica)
January 27, 2017 Filing 128 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #126 Order by AMA Multimedia LLC. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-13857945. (Manolio, Veronica) Modified on 1/31/2017 (DXD).
January 26, 2017 Filing 127 SUR-REPLY to #72 Reply to Response to Motion re: #49 Motions by Plaintiff AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DXD)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER - Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #27 , #49 , #70 ) are granted. The claims against Defendant Sagan are also dismissed on the basis of forum non conveniens. AMA's Motions for Leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery (Docs. #34 , #65 ) are denied as moot. AMA's Motion for Default as to Defendant Sagan (Doc. #82 ) is denied. AMA's Motion for Leave to File a sur-reply (Doc. #77 ) is granted. AMA's Motion to Strike Defendants' Response to AMA's Motion for Leave to file a sur-reply (Doc. #84 ) is denied. The Stipulations to seal (Docs. #116 , #123 ) are denied. The parties should refile motions to seal with "a clear statement of the facts and legal authority justifying the filing of the document under seal" (LRCiv 5.6(b)), and should file redacted versions of the supplemental jurisdictional briefs in the public record. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/26/17.(DXD)
January 20, 2017 Filing 125 REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions (JOINT) by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
December 22, 2016 Filing 123 STIPULATION To File Defendants' Supplemental Briefing Re Personal Jurisdiction Under Seal by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/21/2016. (DGC, nvo)
December 20, 2016 Filing 121 NOTICE re: Filing of Proposed Protective Order by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Van Loon, Erica)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER pursuant to #118 Stipulation: The deadline for Defendants to file their response to AMA's supplemental brief re jurisdictional issues is extended to 12/22/2016. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/16/2016. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER. The Court thought its instructions were clear during the conference call, but apparently they were not. By December 20, 2016, the parties shall provide the Court with one proposed protective order. If the parties cannot agree on a particular provision, the single proposed order shall contain each side's version of that provision, and the Court will choose among them. The parties should also provide the Court with a Word document that matches the single proposed protective order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12-15-16. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
December 15, 2016 Filing 118 STIPULATION re: #64 Order on Motion to Stay Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Defendnats' Response To AMA's Supplemental Briefing re Jurisdictional Issues by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
December 14, 2016 Filing 117 *SEALED LODGED Proposed UNDER SEAL Plaintiff AMA Multimedia, LLC's Supplemental Briefing Re: Personal Jurisdiction. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I (part 1 of 5), #10 Exhibit I (part 2 of 5), #11 Exhibit I (part 3 of 5), #12 Exhibit I (part 4 of 5), #13 Exhibit I (part 5 of 5), #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O)(Manolio, Veronica) Modified on 1/26/2017 (DXD).
December 14, 2016 Filing 116 STIPULATION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF UNDER SEAL by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER pursuant to #114 Stipulation: AMA shall file its supplemental brief re jurisdiction issues on 12/14/2016. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/7/2016. (DGC, nvo)
December 6, 2016 Filing 114 STIPULATION re: #64 Order on Motion to Stay Stipulation re Briefing Schedule by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
December 5, 2016 Filing 113 NOTICE re: Filing of Proposed Protective Order by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Van Loon, Erica)
December 5, 2016 Filing 112 NOTICE re: of Filing Proposed Protective Order by AMA Multimedia LLC . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #110 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
December 2, 2016 Filing 110 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Steven Paul Basileo on behalf of Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, and Sagan Limited. (BAS)
December 2, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PXH179368 as to Steven Paul Basileo. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 30, 2016 Filing 109 *SECOND AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of David Koonar, filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica) *Modified text on 12/1/2016 (EJA).
November 30, 2016 Filing 108 *SECOND AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Philip Bradbury, filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica) *Modified text on 12/1/2016 (EJA).
November 29, 2016 Filing 107 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Telephone Discovery Conference held on 11/29/2016. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 3:19 PM to 4:07 PM.(TCA)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's 30(b)(6) deposition notice and Defendants' objections. The Court will address them by topic number. (1) Defendants' objections to the first topic are not well taken. The witness should be prepared to testify regarding this topic. (2) Defendants' objections, with the exception of the fourth, are not well taken. On the fourth objection, the witness clearly cannot recite from memory the contents of the records listed in this topic, but should be prepared to testify about whether such records exist and, generally, their nature, content, location, and custodian. (3) Defendants' first three objections are not well taken, but its fourth and fifth are valid. The witness should be prepared to identify individuals and entities affiliated with Cyberweb, Ltd. who perform tasks on behalf of or for the benefit of Porn.com. (4) Defendants' first three objections are not well taken, but its fourth through sixth objections are valid, as is its proposed limitation on lines 21-24 of page 6. (5) Defendants' first three objections and fifth objection are not well taken, but its fourth and sixth through eighth objections are valid. The witness should be prepared to testify about relevant communications between Cyberweb and Netmedia relating to operations of Porn.com. (6) Defendants' first four objections are not well taken, but its remaining objections are valid. The witness should be prepared to testify concerning overlapping laborers between Cyberweb, Netmedia, and Porn.com. (7) Defendants' objections are not well taken. The witness should be prepared to testify regarding this topic. (8) Defendants' objections are not well taken, with the exception of the lack of a date limitation. The witness should be prepared to testify regarding this topic for the years 2013-2016. (9) Defendants' objections are not well taken. The witness should be prepared to testify regarding this topic. (10) Defendants' objections are not well taken, with the exception of the lack of a date limitation. The witness should be prepared to testify regarding this topic for the years 2013-2016. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11-29-16. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
November 29, 2016 Filing 105 *AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of 30(b)(6) Representative of Cyberweb, Ltd., filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica) *Modified to add Amended to text on 12/1/2016 (EJA).
November 29, 2016 Filing 104 *AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of David Koonar, filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica) *Modified to add Amended to text on 12/1/2016 (EJA).
November 29, 2016 Filing 103 *AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Philip Bradbury, filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica) *Modified text to add Amended on 12/1/2016 (EJA).
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. A Telephonic discovery conference call is set for 11/29/2016 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for the parties shall coordinate a conference call with the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/28/2016. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo)
November 23, 2016 Filing 101 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or Forum Non Conveniens, Or to Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay Reply in Support of Cyberweb Limited's Motion to Dismiss Based on Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Stay filed by Cyberweb Limited. (Van Loon, Erica)
November 23, 2016 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or Forum Non Conveniens, Or to Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay Reply in Support of Cyberweb Limited's Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens filed by Cyberweb Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Koonar)(Van Loon, Erica)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #90 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #96 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
November 22, 2016 Filing 98 NOTICE of Deposition of 30(b)(6) Representative(s) of Cyberweb, LTD., filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #92 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
November 22, 2016 Filing 96 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Spencer D. Freeman refiled per Clerk's Text Only Entry under Dkt. 95 by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from W.D. Wash.)(Freeman, Spencer)
November 22, 2016 Filing 95 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #90 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Spencer D. Freeman filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. Pro Hac Vice motion submitted with state court certificate of good standing. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please resubmit motion with original certificate of good standing from a federal court. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within seven business days of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 22, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX179004 as to Spencer D Freeman. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 22, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX178935 as to Valentin David Gurvits. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 18, 2016 Filing 94 NOTICE of Deposition of Philip Bradbury, filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
November 18, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE of Deposition of David Koonar, filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
November 18, 2016 Filing 92 AMENDED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Valentin David Gurvits by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Gurvits, Valentin)
November 18, 2016 Filing 91 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Valentin David Gurvits by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Gurvits, Valentin)
November 17, 2016 Filing 90 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Spencer D. Freeman by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Freeman, Spencer)
November 15, 2016 Filing 89 RESPONSE to Motion re: #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or Forum Non Conveniens, Or to Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Manolio, Veronica)
November 15, 2016 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #84 MOTION to Strike #83 Response to Motion FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY filed by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Van Loon, Erica)
November 14, 2016 Filing 87 RESPONSE to Motion re: #70 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or Forum Non Conveniens, Or to Stay Proceedings MOTION to Stay filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
November 9, 2016 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #82 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sagan Limited filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
November 8, 2016 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #82 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sagan Limited filed by Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erica J. Van Loon)(Van Loon, Erica)
November 8, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION to Strike #83 Response to Motion FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
November 7, 2016 Filing 83 RESPONSE to Motion re: #77 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply on Defendant David Koonar's Replies on His: 1) Motion to Stay and 2) Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non-Conveniens filed by Cyberweb Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ross Allan, #2 Affidavit of Philip Bradbury, #3 Affidavit of Kristen Richardson)(Van Loon, Erica)
November 7, 2016 Filing 82 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sagan Limited by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Judgment)(Manolio, Veronica)
November 7, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE of Errata re: #80 Notice of Service of Discovery by Plaintiff AMA Multimedia LLC.. (Manolio, Veronica)
November 4, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
November 3, 2016 Filing 79 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #77 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply on Defendant David Koonar's Replies on His: 1) Motion to Stay and 2) Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non-Conveniens Proposed Order by Plaintiff AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
November 3, 2016 Filing 78 *Filed at (Doc. #127 ) LODGED Proposed Sur-Reply on Defendant David Koonar's Replies on His: 1) Motion to Stay and 2) Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non-Conveniens. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Manolio, Veronica) *Modified on 1/26/2017 (DXD).
November 3, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply on Defendant David Koonar's Replies on His: 1) Motion to Stay and 2) Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non-Conveniens by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Manolio, Veronica)
November 2, 2016 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #65 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery Regarding Defendant David Koonar filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
October 28, 2016 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR TO STAY PROCEEDINGS MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens MOTION to Stay Proceedings Reply in Support of Defendant David Koonar's Motion to Dismiss Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by David Koonar. (Van Loon, Erica)
October 28, 2016 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR TO STAY PROCEEDINGS MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens MOTION to Stay Proceedings Reply in Support of Defendant David Koonar's Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens filed by David Koonar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip Bradbury)(Van Loon, Erica)
October 28, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
October 27, 2016 Filing 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR TO STAY PROCEEDINGS MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens MOTION to Stay Proceedings Reply in Support of Defendant David Koonar's Motion to Stay filed by David Koonar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip Bradbury)(Van Loon, Erica)
October 24, 2016 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #65 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery Regarding Defendant David Koonar filed by David Koonar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Koonar)(Van Loon, Erica)
October 13, 2016 Filing 70 *WITHDRAWN by #185 - MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Or Forum Non Conveniens, Or MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Cyberweb Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Affidavit of Kristen Richardson, #3 Affidavit of Erica J. Van Loon, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica). *Modified to add MOTION to Stay on 10/14/2016 (LSP). *Modified on 8/26/2020 to reflect withdrawn (CLB).
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying #42 Sagan's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and #42 Sagan's Motion to Stay pending the outcome of the Barbados action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/13/16. (DXD)
October 10, 2016 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Motion re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR TO STAY PROCEEDINGS MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
October 10, 2016 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR TO STAY PROCEEDINGS MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Manolio, Veronica)
October 7, 2016 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR TO STAY PROCEEDINGS MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
October 7, 2016 Filing 65 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery Regarding Defendant David Koonar by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Manolio, Veronica)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - A final ruling on the #27 motion to dismiss regarding Netmedia and GLP will be issued after the Court receives the supplemental briefing discussed below. The #27 motion to stay proceedings pending the outcome of the Barbados action is denied. AMA will have until December 2, 2016 to complete limited jurisdictional discovery. If Defendant Cyberweb is going to file a motion to dismiss, that motion shall be filed by October 13, 2016. (See document for complete details.) Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/06/2016. (ATD)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Clerk of Court is directed to strike from the docket in this case the Order entered in error at Doc. 62. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/5/2016. (TCA)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 **STRICKEN BY DOC. 63*ORDER granting #34 Motion for Discovery; taking under advisement #27 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #27 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/5/2016.(DGC, nvo) Modified on 10/5/2016 (TCA).
October 3, 2016 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Stay re: #16 Amended Complaint Reply In Support Of Defendant Sagan Limited's Motion To Stay Proceedings filed by Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip Bradbury, #2 Affidavit of Kristen Richardson, #3 Affidavit of Erica J. Van Loon)(Van Loon, Erica)
October 3, 2016 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Stay re: #16 Amended Complaint filed by Sagan Limited. (Van Loon, Erica)
September 27, 2016 Filing 59 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiff AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 5/19/2017. Dispositive motions due by 6/23/2017.Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/22/2016. (TCA)
September 21, 2016 Filing 57 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell: Scheduling Conference held on 9/21/2016. Discussion held. Pending motions discussed. Deadlines discussed. Court will enter a case management order. APPEARANCES: Veronica Manolio for Plaintiff. Erica Van Loon for Defendants (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) Hearing held 4:39 PM to 4:55 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
September 20, 2016 Filing 56 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AMA Multimedia LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Order granting Motion for Alternative Service, Summons, First Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Re Copyright, Notice of Availability of a US Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, Order (Doc. 7) upon Cyberweb, Ltd. on 9/20/16. (Manolio, Veronica)
September 20, 2016 Filing 55 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Defendants GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ivan Alert, #2 Exhibit A)(Van Loon, Erica)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Alternative Service. The Court concludes that Plaintiff made a good-faith effort to serve Defendant Cyberweb, LTD, without success. See Doc. 36-2 at 2-7. Alternative service under Rule 4(f)(3) will be permitted. See Rio Properties, Inc. v. Rio Int'l Interlink, 284 F.3d 1007, 1014 (9th Cir. 2002). Plaintiff shall, within 10 days of this order, serve Defendant Cyberweb, LTD by (1) facsimile to Zarina Kahn and Ivan Alert, Attorneys-at-Law, Cyberweb, LTD's counsel in the action it filed before the Barbados Supreme Court, (2) email to David Koonar at producertm@gmail.com, and (3) email to counsel for Defendants Sagan, LTD, GLP 5, Inc., Netmedia Services, Inc., and David Koonar. The Court concludes that such service is reasonably calculated, under all the circumstances, to apprise Defendant Cyberweb, LTD of the pendency of this action and afford it an opportunity to present its position. Plaintiff shall copy this text-only order and include it with the service. The request for attorneys' fees is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9-14-16. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC) Modified text on 9/15/2016 (KMG).
September 14, 2016 Filing 53 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Van Loon, Erica)
September 14, 2016 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re: #42 MOTION to Stay re: #16 Amended Complaint filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Silverman, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Karen Perreira)(Manolio, Veronica) Modified on 9/15/2016 (KMG).
September 14, 2016 Filing 51 RESPONSE to Motion re: #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Silverman)(Manolio, Veronica) Modified on 9/15/2016 (KMG).
September 6, 2016 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #34 MOTION for Discovery MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
September 6, 2016 Filing 49 * MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by David Koonar. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Affidavit of David Koonar, #3 Affidavit of Erica J. Van Loon, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica). * Added MOTION to Dismiss Case for Forum Non Conveniens, MOTION to Stay Proceedings on 9/7/2016 (LAD).
September 6, 2016 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #36 MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE ON CYBERWEB, LTD. filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Manolio, Veronica)
August 26, 2016 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #34 MOTION for Discovery MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY filed by GLP 5 Incorporated, Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Van Loon, Erica)
August 26, 2016 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #36 MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE ON CYBERWEB, LTD. filed by GLP 5 Incorporated, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erica J. Van Loon, #2 Affidavit of Philip Bradbury)(Van Loon, Erica)
August 26, 2016 Filing 45 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #27 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Barbados Action filed by GLP 5 Incorporated, Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ivan Alert, #2 Affidavit of Philip Bradbury)(Van Loon, Erica) *Modified to add/correct text on 8/29/2016 (KMG).
August 26, 2016 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE BARBADOS ACTION MOTION to Stay filed by GLP 5 Incorporated, Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ross Allan)(Van Loon, Erica)
August 15, 2016 Filing 43 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AMA Multimedia LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Order re Alternative Service on David Koonar (Doc. 35), Summons (Doc. 6), First Amended Complaint (Doc. 16), Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 3), Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (Doc. 4), Notice of Availability of a US Magistrate Judge (Doc. 5), Order (Doc. 7) upon David Koonar on 8/10/16. (Manolio, Veronica)
August 12, 2016 Filing 42 * MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Stay re: #16 Amended Complaint by Sagan Limited, GLP 5 Incorporated, Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities iso Sagan Limited's Motion to Dismiss or Stay, #2 Affidavit of Erica J. Van Loon, #3 Affidavit of Kristen Richardson, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica) * Modified to add additional filers on 8/15/2016 (LAD).
August 12, 2016 Filing 41 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AMA Multimedia LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Sagan Limited on 7/27/16. (Manolio, Veronica)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Continue. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2016 at 4:00 PM is VACATED and RESET to 9/21/2016 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/10/2016.(DGC, nvo)
August 10, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION to Continue RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
August 10, 2016 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE BARBADOS ACTION filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Silverman, #2 Declaration of Adam Silverman, #3 Declaration of Adam Silverman, #4 Declaration of Jason Tucker, #5 Declaration of Aleksandr Heit)(LSP)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #31 Plaintiff AMA Multimedia's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk is directed to accept for filing the document lodged on the Court's docket as (Doc. #32 ). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/9/16.(LSP)
August 9, 2016 Filing 36 MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE ON CYBERWEB, LTD. by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Alternative Service. First, counsel on both sides are advised that further personal attacks shall not be permitted, in court filings or otherwise. Counsel shall deal with each professionally and courteously. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 1. Second, surreplies are not permitted without leave of court, and requests for surreplies will be denied unless truly new developments have occurred. Third, the Court concludes that Plaintiff has made good-faith efforts to serve Defendant Koonar, without success. Alternative service under Rule 4(f)(3) will be permitted. See Rio Properties, Inc. v. Rio Int'l Interlink, 284 F.3d 1007, 1014 (9th Cir. 2002). Plaintiff shall, within 10 days of this order, serve Defendant Koonar by (1) email at producertm@gmail.com, (2) regular mail addressed to Defendant Koonar at 1785 Turner Road, Windsor, Ontario, Canada, and (3) by sending a copy of the service to counsel for Defendants GLP 5 and Netmedia Services, Inc. The Court concludes that such service is reasonably calculated, under all the circumstances, to apprise Defendant Koonar of the pendency of this action and afford him an opportunity to present his position. Plaintiff shall copy this text-only order and include it with the service. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8-9-16. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
August 9, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION for Discovery MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Adam Silverman, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jason Tucker, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Aleksandr Heit, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Barbados Claim)(Manolio, Veronica)
August 8, 2016 Filing 33 * RESPONSE to #27 MOTION to Stay Opposition to Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Spencer Freeman, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Silverman Part 1, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Silverman Part 2, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Karen Perreira)(Manolio, Veronica) * Modified to correct document linkage and text on 8/9/2016 (LAD).
August 8, 2016 Filing 32 *Filed at (Doc. #38 )--LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT re #31 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages - RESPONSE to Motion re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE BARBADOS ACTION MOTION to Stay filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Silverman Part 1, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Silverman Part 2, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Silverman Part 3, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Tucker Part 1, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Tucker Part 2, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Tucker Part 3, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Aleksandr Heit)(Manolio, Veronica) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 8/9/2016 (LAD). Modified on 8/10/2016 (LSP).
August 8, 2016 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Exceed Page Limit by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2016 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/5/2016. (DGC, nvo)
July 18, 2016 Filing 29 Service Returned Unexecuted by AMA Multimedia LLC : Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action for Appeal Re a Copyright, and Notice of Availability of a Magitrate Judge to Order as to David Koonar. (Manolio, Veronica)
July 13, 2016 Filing 28 *SURREPLY to Response to Motion re: #22 MOTION for Leave for Alternative Service Surreply filed by GLP 5 Incorporated, Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Erica J. Van Loon and Exhibits, #2 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Philip Bradbury and Exhibits)(Van Loon, Erica) *Modified text on 7/14/2016 (EJA).
July 8, 2016 Filing 27 *WITHDRAWN by #185 - MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE BARBADOS ACTION by GLP 5 Incorporated, Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, #2 Affidavit Erica Van Loon, #3 Affidavit Philip Bradbury, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica). *Added MOTION to Stay on 7/11/2016 (KGM). Modified on 8/26/2020 to reflect withdrawn (CLB).
July 7, 2016 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #22 MOTION for Leave for Alternative Service filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Manolio, Veronica)
July 6, 2016 Filing 25 Service Returned Unexecuted by AMA Multimedia LLC : Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Re Copyright, Notice of Availability of a Magitrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, Order as to David Koonar. (Manolio, Veronica)
July 6, 2016 Filing 24 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AMA Multimedia LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action for Appeal Re Copyright, Notice of Availability of a Magistrate Judge, Order upon Netmedia Services, Inc. on 6/1/16. (Manolio, Veronica)
June 28, 2016 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #22 MOTION for Leave for Alternative Service filed by GLP 5 Incorporated, Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Erica Van Loon, #2 Affidavit of Philip Bradbury)(Van Loon, Erica)
June 27, 2016 Filing 22 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave for Alternative Service by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
June 15, 2016 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by AMA Multimedia LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Re a Copyright, and Notice of Availability of a Magitrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction upon GLP 5, Inc. on 5/19/16. (Manolio, Veronica)
June 13, 2016 Filing 20 * NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information (no changes) by AMA Multimedia LLC . (Manolio, Veronica) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 6/14/2016 (LAD).
June 13, 2016 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Cyberweb Limited. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 10, 2016 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #16 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event:Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (EJA)
June 10, 2016 Filing 17 SUMMONS Submitted by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Manolio, Veronica)
June 9, 2016 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by AMA Multimedia LLC.(Manolio, Veronica)
June 9, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by AMA Multimedia LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Manolio, Veronica)
June 6, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE re: of Service of Order (Doc. 7) by AMA Multimedia LLC . (Manolio, Veronica)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GLP 5 Incorporated answer due 7/8/2016; Netmedia Services Incorporated answer due 7/8/2016. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/6/2016.(DGC, nvo)
June 6, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Errata by Plaintiff AMA Multimedia LLC.. (Manolio, Veronica)
June 6, 2016 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by AMA Multimedia LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Manolio, Veronica)
June 3, 2016 Filing 10 *MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by GLP 5 Incorporated, Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erica J. Van Loon and Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Philip Bradbury, #3 Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica) *Modified to remove Ex Parte Designation on 6/6/2016 (EJA).
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 2, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Erica J Van Loon on behalf of GLP 5 Incorporated and Netmedia Services Incorporated. (BAS)
June 2, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX172614 as to Erica J Van Loon. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/2/2016. (DGC, nvo)
April 29, 2016 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GLP 5 Incorporated, David Koonar, MXN LTD, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(KGM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 28, 2016 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12905878. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-1269-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KGM)
April 28, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by AMA Multimedia LLC (submitted by Veronica Manolio). (KGM)
April 28, 2016 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMA Multimedia LLC (submitted by Veronica Manolio). (KGM)
April 28, 2016 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by AMA Multimedia LLC (submitted by Veronica Manolio). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(KGM)
April 28, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12905878 filed by AMA Multimedia LLC (submitted by Veronica Manolio). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KGM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMA Multimedia LLC v. Sagan Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagan Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MXN Limited a Barbados company, individually and doing business as Porn.com
Represented By: Valentin David Gurvits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Koonar
Represented By: Erica J Van Loon
Represented By: Steven Paul Basileo
Represented By: Valentin David Gurvits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyberweb Limited formerly MXN LTD., a Barbados Company, individually and doing business as Porn.com
Represented By: Erica J Van Loon
Represented By: Steven Paul Basileo
Represented By: Valentin David Gurvits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagan Limited a Republic of Seychelles company, individually and doing business as Porn.com
Represented By: Erica J Van Loon
Represented By: Steven Paul Basileo
Represented By: Valentin David Gurvits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netmedia Services Incorporated a Canadian company, individually and doing business as Porn.com
Represented By: Erica J Van Loon
Represented By: Steven Paul Basileo
Represented By: Valentin David Gurvits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLP 5 Incorporated a Michigan company, individually and doing business as Trafficforce.com
Represented By: Erica J Van Loon
Represented By: Steven Paul Basileo
Represented By: Valentin David Gurvits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMA Multimedia LLC
Represented By: Veronica Lynn Manolio
Represented By: Spencer D Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?