Hydentra HLP Int. Limited et al v. Sagan Limited et al
Plaintiff: Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated a foreign corporation doing business as Metart doing business as Sexart and Hydentra HLP Int. Limited a foreign corporation doing business as Metart doing business as Sexart
Defendant: Sagan Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated a Canadian Company, individually and: doing business as Porn.com, David Koonar, Unknown Parties, Sagan Limited a Republic of Seychelles company, individually and: doing business as Porn.com and MXN Limited a Barbados Company, individually and: doing business as Porn.com
Case Number: 2:2016cv01494
Filed: May 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER that the parties' stipulation of dismissal with prejudice #82 is granted. This matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this matter. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/17/2020. (CLB)
July 14, 2020 Filing 82 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Fray-Witzer, Evan)
April 10, 2020 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Shayefar, Matthew)
April 10, 2020 Filing 80 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MXN Limited. (Shayefar, Matthew)
April 10, 2020 Filing 79 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sagan Limited. (Shayefar, Matthew)
April 1, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (CLB)
March 23, 2020 Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #76 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK)
March 20, 2020 Filing 76 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited.(Shayefar, Matthew)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Discovery due by 12/4/2020. Dispositive motions due by 4/9/2021. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/11/2020. (DGC, nvo)
February 28, 2020 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM Joint Proposed Case Management Plan #71 Order on Motion for Hearing on Motion by Plaintiffs Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Manolio, Veronica)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying Defendants' #72 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/26/20. (CLB)
February 24, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #71 Order on Motion for Hearing on Motion by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fray-Witzer, Evan)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying #69 Motion for Hearing on Motion. On or before 2/28/2020 the parties shall file a joint memorandum setting forth a proposed discovery and motion schedule for completing this case. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/10/2020.(DGC, nvo)
September 18, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re: #69 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #35 MOTION to Dis Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Evidentiary Hearing filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Manolio, Veronica)
September 11, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Spencer D Freeman on behalf of Plaintiffs Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 4, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Fray-Witzer, Evan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re: #67 USCA Mandate. On or before 9/27/2019, the parties shall file a joint memorandum concerning the status of this case and what steps counsel believe need to be taken to complete this matter. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/27/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 67 MANDATE of USCA (17-16637) revering and remanding re: #63 Notice of Appeal filed by Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated, Hydentra HLP Int. Limited. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(LAD)
August 16, 2017 Filing 65 USCA Case Number re: #63 Notice of Appeal; Ninth Circuit Case number 17-16637. (ATD)
August 15, 2017 Filing 64 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated re: #63 Notice of Appeal. (Manolio, Veronica)
August 15, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #62 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-14546003. (Manolio, Veronica)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #35 , #36 , #37 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The clerk is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/17/17.(DXD)
July 17, 2017 Filing 61 SEALED REPLY In Opposition to Response to Motion re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by David Koonar. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of David Koonar, #2 Deply Declaration of Kristen Richardson, #3 Exhibit A to Richardson Reply Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to to Richardson Reply Declaration)(MAP)
July 17, 2017 Filing 60 SEALED REPLY In Opposition to Response to Motion re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Netmedia Services Incorporated. (MAP)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to accept for filing under seal the documents lodged on the Court's docket as Docs. 55 and 56. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/17/17.(MAP)
June 20, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE re: Supplemental Authority by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bristol-Myers Squibb v. Superior Court of California)(Shayefar, Matthew)
May 23, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE re: Supplemental Authorities by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Shayefar, Matthew)
May 2, 2017 Filing 56 *FILED at Doc. #61 *SEALED LODGED Proposed Defendant David Koonar's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for (1) Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and (2) Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #54 Stipulation. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by David Koonar. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of David Koonar, #2 Reply Declaration of Kristen Richardson, #3 Exhibit A to Richardson Reply Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Richardson Reply Declaration)(Shayefar, Matthew) *Modified on 7/17/2017 (MAP)*.
May 2, 2017 Filing 55 *FILED at Doc. #60 *SEALED LODGED Proposed Defendant Netmedia Services, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for (1) Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and (2) Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted re: #54 Stipulation, #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Shayefar, Matthew) *Modified on 7/17/2017 (MAP)*.
May 2, 2017 Filing 54 STIPULATION to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply Briefs in Support of Motions to Dismiss by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shayefar, Matthew)
May 2, 2017 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MXN Limited, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Shayefar, #2 Exhibits 1-8 to Shayefar Declaration, #3 Exhibits 9-17 to Shayefar Declaration, #4 Declaration of Esther Martinez)(Shayefar, Matthew)
April 20, 2017 Filing 52 RESPONSE to Motion re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim REDACTED VERSION filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Manolio, Veronica)
April 20, 2017 Filing 51 MOTION to Seal Document #49 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
April 19, 2017 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (REDACTED VERSION) filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J (PART 1 OF 4), #11 Exhibit J (PART 2 OF 4), #12 Exhibit J (PART 3 OF 4), #13 Exhibit J (PART 4 OF 4), #14 Exhibit K)(Manolio, Veronica)
April 19, 2017 Filing 49 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (REDACTED VERSION) filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Manolio, Veronica) *Modified on 4/25/2017 to Temporarily Seal Pending the Filing of a Motion to Seal (MAP)*.
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER pursuant to #47 Stipulation: re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Netmedia Services Incorporated, #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MXN Limited, Sagan Limited, #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by David Koonar. Replies due 5/2/2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/18/2017. (DGC, nvo)
April 17, 2017 Filing 47 STIPULATION re: #41 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #40 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #38 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Extend Time to File Replies in Support of Motions to Dismiss by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shayefar, Matthew)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re: #43 Order on Stipulation. Order amended to reflect proper party to file redacted documents by 4/19/2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/2017. (DGC, nvo)
April 12, 2017 Filing 45 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re: #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited and Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Exhibits C-G, #3 Exhibits H-I, #4 Exhibit J - Part 1, #5 Exhibit J - Part 2, #6 Exhibit J - Part 3, #7 Exhibit J - Part 4, #8 Exhibit K) (ATD)
April 12, 2017 Filing 44 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited and Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (ATD)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #39 Stipulation : IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Netmedia Services, Inc. and David Koonar's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Seal is granted. The Clerk is directed to accept for filing under seal the documents lodged on the Court's docket as Docs. #40 , #41 . Defendants shall file redacted copies of their Opposition on the public docket no later than April 19, 2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/12/2017. (ATD)
April 11, 2017 Filing 42 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint, upon Sagan Limited on February 21, 2017. (Manolio, Veronica)
April 10, 2017 Filing 41 ***FILED at (Doc. #45 )--SEALED LODGED Proposed Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant David Koonar's Motion to Dismiss for (1) Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and (2) Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted re: #39 Stipulation. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J - Part 1 of 4, #11 Exhibit J - Part 2 of 4, #12 Exhibit J - Part 3 of 4, #13 Exhibit J - Part 4 of 4, #14 Exhibit K)(Manolio, Veronica) Modified on 4/12/2017 (ATD).
April 10, 2017 Filing 40 ***FILED at (Doc. #44 )--SEALED LODGED Proposed Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Netmedia Services, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for (1) Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and (2) Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted re: #39 Stipulation. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Manolio, Veronica) Modified on 4/12/2017 (ATD).
April 10, 2017 Filing 39 STIPULATION to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants Netmedia Services, Inc. and David Koonar's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Seal by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
April 10, 2017 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re: #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jason Tucker Declaration, #2 Exhibit Jon Krogman Declaration)(Manolio, Veronica)
March 10, 2017 Filing 37 *MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by David Koonar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Koonar)(Shayefar, Matthew). *Added MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on 3/13/2017 (REK).
March 10, 2017 Filing 36 *MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Netmedia Services Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip Bradbury)(Shayefar, Matthew). *Added MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on 3/13/2017 (REK).
March 10, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MXN Limited, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Transcript of Oral Arguments, #2 Declaration of Kristen Richardson)(Shayefar, Matthew)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #33 Motion to exceed page limits. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/8/2017.(DGC, nvo)
March 7, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit by MXN Limited, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shayefar, Matthew)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER pursuant to #31 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : David Koonar answer due 3/10/2017; MXN Limited answer due 3/10/2017; Netmedia Services Incorporated answer due 3/10/2017; Sagan Limited answer due 3/10/2017. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/28/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC, nvo)
February 28, 2017 Filing 31 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shayefar, Matthew)
February 8, 2017 Filing 30 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summonses, Complaint, Plaintiffs' Corporate Disclosure Statement, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Re Copyright, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge form upon Sagan Limited, MXN Ltd. (now known as Cyberweb, Ltd.), Netmedia Services, Inc., and David Koonar on February 8, 2017. (Manolio, Veronica)
February 7, 2017 Filing 29 Sur-REPLY re: #12 EX PARTE Motion for Alternative Service on Defendants by Defendants David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (REK)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for alternative service (Doc. #12 ) is granted. Defendants' motion to file a sur-reply (Doc. #19 ) is granted. The Clerk shall accept for filing the sur-reply lodged on the Court's docket as Doc. #20 . Plaintiffs' motion to strike (Doc. #21 ) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/07/2017. (REK)
January 9, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE re: of Service of Order Doc. 26 by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated re: #26 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Manolio, Veronica)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/6/2017. (DGC, nvo)
December 30, 2016 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge David G. Campbell. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-16-1494-PHX-DGC. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for January 9, 2017 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 30, 2016 Filing 24 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order that David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/9/2017 at 04:30 PM before Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
December 12, 2016 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #21 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (And Its Sur-Reply) Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Alternative Service filed by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Fray-Witzer, Evan)
December 12, 2016 Filing 21 *MOTION to Strike #19 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (And Its Sur-Reply) #20 Re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Alternative Service by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica) *Modified to add document links on 12/13/2016 (REK).
December 6, 2016 Filing 20 ***Filed at #29 per Order #28 ***LODGED Proposed Sur-Reply re: #19 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Fray-Witzer, Evan) Modified on 2/7/2017 (REK).
December 6, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur Reply)(Fray-Witzer, Evan)
November 28, 2016 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION for Alternative Service on Defendants filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Manolio, Veronica)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
November 18, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 105, receipt number PHX178839 as to Evan Fray-Witzer, Matthew Shayefar, Valentin David Gurvits. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 16, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Valentin David Gurvits by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Gurvits, Valentin)
November 16, 2016 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Alternative Service on Defendants filed by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript Excerpt, #2 Exhibit Dismissal Order, #3 Exhibit News Articles)(Fray-Witzer, Evan)
November 16, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Matthew Shayefar by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Shayefar, Matthew)
November 16, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Evan Fray-Witzer by David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Fray-Witzer, Evan)
November 10, 2016 Filing 12 EX PARTE MOTION for Alternative Service on Defendants by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Manolio, Veronica)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff's request for an additional 30-day extension of time to serve Defendants, or to file a motion for alternative service. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 12/12/2016. (REK)
September 27, 2016 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #9 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Manolio, Veronica)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of the filing of this Order to show good cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed.R.Civ.P. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, this action shall be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 9/06/2016. (REK)
May 20, 2016 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 18, 2016 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to David Koonar, MXN Limited, Netmedia Services Incorporated, Sagan Limited. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 17, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons MXN, #2 Summons Netmedia, #3 Summons Sagan Limited)(Manolio, Veronica)
May 16, 2016 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12969914. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David K. Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-01494-PHX-DKD. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
May 16, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (submitted by Veronica Manolio) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REK)
May 16, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (submitted by Veronica Manolio) (REK)
May 16, 2016 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited, Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated. (submitted by Veronica Manolio) (REK)
May 16, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-12969914 filed by Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated, Hydentra HLP Int. Limited. (submitted by Veronica Manolio) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hydentra HLP Int. Limited et al v. Sagan Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagan Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netmedia Services Incorporated a Canadian Company, individually and: doing business as Porn.com
Represented By: Evan Fray-Witzer
Represented By: Matthew Shayefar
Represented By: Valentin David Gurvits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Koonar
Represented By: Evan Fray-Witzer
Represented By: Matthew Shayefar
Represented By: Valentin David Gurvits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagan Limited a Republic of Seychelles company, individually and: doing business as Porn.com
Represented By: Evan Fray-Witzer
Represented By: Matthew Shayefar
Represented By: Valentin David Gurvits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MXN Limited a Barbados Company, individually and: doing business as Porn.com
Represented By: Evan Fray-Witzer
Represented By: Matthew Shayefar
Represented By: Valentin David Gurvits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hydentra HLP Int. Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hydentra LP HLP General Partner Incorporated a foreign corporation doing business as Metart doing business as Sexart
Represented By: Spencer D Freeman
Represented By: Veronica Lynn Manolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hydentra HLP Int. Limited a foreign corporation doing business as Metart doing business as Sexart
Represented By: Spencer D Freeman
Represented By: Veronica Lynn Manolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?