Continental Circuits LLC v. Intel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Continental Circuits LLC
Defendant: Intel Corporation, Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion and Ibiden Corporation Limited
Case Number: 2:2016cv02026
Filed: June 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting / denying in part 344 Motion to Compel FURTHER ORDERED granting 340 , 350 , 362 Joint Motions to Seal. The Clerk is directed to accept for filing under seal Docs. 341 , 351 , 363 and 364 . The Clerk is further directed to maintain the numbering of the sealed documents as currently indicated on the docket. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/27/20. (MAP)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER re: 283 USCA Mandate, 325 Brief (Non Appeal) filed by Continental Circuits LLC, 324 Memorandum filed by Ibiden U.S.A. Corporation, Ibiden Company Limited, Intel Corporation. See Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/16/2019. (DGC, nvo)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER re: 189 , 188 Markman Briefing and hearing. See Order for additional detail. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/9/2017. (DGC, nvo)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting/denying in part 142 (redacted version), 147 (sealed version) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to State a Claim. The motion is granted as to Plaintiff's (a) direct infringement claims against Ibiden as to unna med products sold to customers other than Intel, (b) indirect infringement claims related to the unnamed Ibiden products intended for customers other than Intel, and (c) willfulness claims against both Defendants. The motion is denied as to Plaintiff's induced infringement claims against Intel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/16/17. (MAP)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/21/2017.(DGC, nvo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Circuits LLC v. Intel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Circuits LLC
Represented By: Bradley W Caldwell
Represented By: Jason D Cassady
Represented By: John Austin Curry
Represented By: Warren J McCarty, III
Represented By: Jason S McManis
Represented By: Joseph A Schenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ibiden U.S.A. Corportion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ibiden Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?