Young v. Colvin
Plaintiff: William Thomas Young
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv02264
Filed: July 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 20 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/2017.(DGC, nvo)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 16 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/28/2017.(DGC, nvo)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The final decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is reversed. This matter is remanded with instructions to review the record as a whole and issue a new decision. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and terminate this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/21/2017. (REK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Represented By: Erin Highland(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Thomas Young
Represented By: Mark Ross Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?