Parker #270777 v. Arizona, State of

Petitioner: Chastabear Parker
Respondent: Arizona, State of and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2016cv02404
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Bridget S Bade
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the petitioner's Motion: Reconsideration (Doc. 41 ) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall provide the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this Order to be filed in the petitioner's appeal, case number 17-17040. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/1/17.(SLQ)
September 28, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 34 ) is accepted and adopted by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petitioner's Amended Petition Under 28 U.S.C. & #167; 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (Doc. 5 ) is denied and that this action is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Certificate of Appealability shall not issue and that leave to appeal in forma pau peris is denied because the dismissal of the petitioner's habeas petition is justified by a plain procedural bar and reasonable jurists would not find the ruling debatable. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petitioner's Motion: Extension of Time to File Specific Written Objections to the Report and Recommendation (Doc. 35 ) is granted to the extent that the petitioner's Motion: Specific Written Objections to the Magistrate's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 36 ) is deemed to have been timely filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the petitioner's following motions are all denied: Motion: Request for Introduction of Withheld Evidence (Doc. 11 ); Motion: Notice of Denial of Access to Courts and Denial of Meaningful Appe al Re: Motion for Introduction of Withheld Evidence (Doc. 32 ); and Motion: Release Pending Appeal (Doc. 37 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/27/17. (SLQ)
November 28, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 15 . Petitioner's Motion: Request for Bail 13 is denied. See order for additional details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/28/2016. (LMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker #270777 v. Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chastabear Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona, State of
Represented By: William Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: William Scott Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?