Cytron v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Adam C Cytron
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation, USAA Federal Savings Bank, Jason P Sherman, Kari Sheehan, Daniel C Schmidt and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2016cv02441
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 45 Ex Parte Motion. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/5/17. (LAD)
December 12, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 and 27 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend on or before 12/30/16. Clerk shall enter dismissal if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/12/16.(LSP)
September 1, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining (Doc. 18 ) is denied. Plaintiff's other motions (Docs. 11 , 12 , 14 ) are denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/1/16.(KGM)
July 22, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order without notice and denying 3 Plaintiff's motion for leave to appear in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/22/16.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cytron v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason P Sherman
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Sheehan
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel C Schmidt
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam C Cytron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?