Frankel v. Aramark Business Facilities LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ivy Frankel
Defendant: Aramark Services Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2016cv03101
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. [See attached order for additional information.] Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/11/2019. (RMW)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying Defendants' 87 Motion to Strike. FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiff's 86 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiff's 89 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (See Order for details.) Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/9/2018. (MMO)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting Defendant's 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/16/2018. (ATD)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that by October 7, 2016, Defendant shall file a supplement to the notice of removal properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction or this case will be remanded to state court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/30/2016. (KAL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frankel v. Aramark Business Facilities LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Frankel
Represented By: Jason Adrian Hutzler
Represented By: Samuel Paul Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Services Incorporated
Represented By: Jeremy C Johnson
Represented By: Sarah Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?