Goedecke #080048 v. Mooney et al

Plaintiff: Walter C Goedecke
Defendant: Unknown Mooney, Kataushia Thomas, Vanessa Headstream and Cindy Black
Case Number: 2:2016cv03432
Filed: October 7, 2016
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 31 Report and Recommendation is accepted. Plaintiff's action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Court orders and failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/17/18. (MSA)
March 2, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 26 - IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Thomas is dismissed, without prejudice. Because other Defendants remain in this case, the Clerk of the Court shall not enter judgment at this time. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/2/18. (LAD)
October 23, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - striking the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 14 ) without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause no later than November 6, 2017 why his Complaint (Doc. 1 ) as to Defendant Thomas should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 10/23/2017. (KAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goedecke #080048 v. Mooney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter C Goedecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kataushia Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Headstream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?