Arizona Democratic Party et al v. Reagan Featured Case

Plaintiff: Arizona Democratic Party and Democratic National Committee
Defendant: Michele Reagan
Case Number: 2:2016cv03618
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2016 40 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed November 3, 2016, judgment of dismissal is entered. Plaintiffs to take nothing, and the complaint and action are hereby dismissed. (LAD)
November 3, 2016 39 Featured Case ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (Doc. 31 ) is denied; 2. That Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement (Doc. 34 ) is granted; 3. That the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 2 ) is denied; 4. That the Motion to Modify the Relief Sought (Doc. 37 ) is denied as moot; 5. That Plaintiffs' request for declaratory judgment, permanent injunction is denied; and 6. That the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/3/16.(LAD)
November 2, 2016 38 RESPONSE to Motion re: 37 MOTION to Modify the Relief Sought Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Relief Sought filed by Michele Reagan. (Karlson, Kara)
November 2, 2016 37 MOTION to Modify the Relief Sought by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dul, Sambo)
October 31, 2016 36 RESPONSE to Motion re: 34 First MOTION to Supplement the Record of the October 21, 2016 Permanent Injunction Hearing filed by Michele Reagan. (Perkins, Jennifer)
October 31, 2016 35 Featured Case ORDER that, no later than 11:00 a.m. today, October 31, 2016, Defendant must file a response to Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement 34 , specifically addressing its position as to the contents of this article and what impact, if any, it has on the relief sought in this case. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 10/31/16. (CLB)
October 31, 2016 34 First MOTION to Supplement the Record of the October 21, 2016 Permanent Injunction Hearing by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dul, Sambo)
October 28, 2016 33 NOTICE re: Supplemental Authority by Michele Reagan . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6th Circuit Court of Appeals Decision)(Karlson, Kara)
October 28, 2016 32 RESPONSE to Motion re: 31 First MOTION to Strike 29 Reply (Exhibits B and D) Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike filed by Michele Reagan. (Karlson, Kara)
October 27, 2016 31 First MOTION to Strike 29 Reply (Exhibits B and D) by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dul, Sambo)
October 25, 2016 29 REPLY re: 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Surreply by Defendant Michele Reagan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Surreply Exh. A, # 2 Exhibit Surreply Exh. B, # 3 Exhibit Surreply Exh. C, # 4 Exhibit Surreply Exh. D)(Perkins, Jennifer)
October 25, 2016 28 NOTICE re: of Filing Defendant's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Michele Reagan . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Perkins, Jennifer)
October 25, 2016 27 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 26 Notice (Other) Proposed Form of Permanent Injunction by Plaintiffs Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. (Danneman, Alexis)
October 25, 2016 26 NOTICE re: Filing of Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Danneman, Alexis)
October 24, 2016 25 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 24, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX177860 as to Marc E Elias. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 24, 2016 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Marc E Elias on behalf of Arizona Democratic Party and Democratic National Committee. (BAS)
October 24, 2016 23 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Michele Reagan for proceedings held on 10/21/2016, Judge Steven P Logan hearing judge(s). (Perkins, Jennifer)
October 24, 2016 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re: 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. (Danneman, Alexis)
October 21, 2016 30 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PERMANENT INJUNCTION HEARING proceedings held on 10/21/2016, before Judge Steven P. Logan. (Court Reporter: Candy L. Potter). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (RAP)
October 21, 2016 21 Witness List by Michele Reagan. (NKS)
October 21, 2016 20 Witness List by Arizona Democratic Party & Democratic National Committee. (NKS)
October 21, 2016 19 Exhibit List by Michele Reagan. (NKS)
October 21, 2016 18 Exhibit List by Arizona Democratic Party & Democratic National Committee. (NKS)
October 21, 2016 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Steven P. Logan: Permanent Injunction Hearing held on 10/21/16. Matter taken under advisement. Order to follow. See minutes for details. (Court Reporter Candy Potter.) Hearing held 1:34 p.m. to 4:57 p.m. (NKS)
October 21, 2016 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Perkins on behalf of Michele Reagan. (Perkins, Jennifer)
October 21, 2016 15 NOTICE re: of filing exhibit and witness list by Michele Reagan . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit List)(Perkins, Jennifer)
October 21, 2016 14 RESPONSE to Motion re: 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Michele Reagan. (Perkins, Jennifer)
October 21, 2016 13 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee for proceedings held on 10/21/2016, Judge Steven P Logan hearing judge(s). (Ryerson, Thomas)
October 20, 2016 12 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 20, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX177762 as to Kevin J Hamilton. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 20, 2016 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kevin J. Hamilton by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hamilton, Kevin)
October 20, 2016 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee: Affidavit of Service re: Order (Doc. 8) upon Arizona Secretary of State on 10/20/2016. (Danneman, Alexis)
October 20, 2016 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Declaration of Sambo Dul, Declaration of Spencer Scharff, Proposed Temporary Restraining Order upon Arizona Secretary of State on 10/20/2016. (Danneman, Alexis)
October 20, 2016 8 Featured Case ORDER: The Court will exercise its discretion to advance the trial on the merits in this action and consolidate a hearing on permanent injunction with a hearing on the pending requests for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. No later than 5:00 p.m., today, October 20, 2016, Plaintiffs must serve a copy on Defendant and file proof of service with the Court of the following: (1) the Verified Complaint; (2) the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and attachments; and (3) this Order and its attachments. Permanent Injunction Hearing is set for 10/21/16 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. Defendant shall have until October 21, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. to file any Response to Plaintiffs' Motion; Plaintiffs shall have until October 24, 2016 at 12:00 p.m. to file any Reply; and Defendant shall have until October 25, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. to file any Surreply. Each party must submit separate Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law no later than October 25, 2016. Plaintiffs shall submit a proposed form of permanent injunction no later than October 25, 2016. The parties shall mark, list, and deliver exhibits in the manner prescribed in Attachment A no later than October 21, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall complete and provide Exhibit and Witness Lists in the manner prescribed in Attachment A no later than October 21, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. See Order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/20/16. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(SJF)
October 20, 2016 7 Summons Issued as to Michele Reagan. (DXD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 19, 2016 6 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-13519705. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-03618-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD)
October 19, 2016 5 DECLARATION of Spencer G Scharff re: 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee (submitted by Sambo Dul). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (DXD)
October 19, 2016 4 DECLARATION of Sambo Dul re: 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee (submitted by Sambo Dul). (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 8, # 2 Part 3 of 8, # 3 Part 4 of 8, # 4 Part 5 of 8, # 5 Part 6 of 8, # 6 Part 7 of 8, # 7 Part 8 of 8) (DXD)
October 19, 2016 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee (submitted by Sambo Dul). (DXD)
October 19, 2016 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Arizona Democratic Party, Democratic National Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (DXD)
October 19, 2016 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13519705 filed by Democratic National Committee, Arizona Democratic Party (submitted by Sambo Dul). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona Democratic Party et al v. Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Democratic Party
Represented By: Joshua L Boehm
Represented By: Alexis Elizabeth Danneman
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Kevin J Hamilton
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Joshua L Boehm
Represented By: Alexis Elizabeth Danneman
Represented By: Sambo Dul
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Kevin J Hamilton
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Reagan
Represented By: Kara Karlson
Represented By: Jennifer Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?