Priestley v. Two houses et al
Plaintiff: John Priestley, Jr.
Defendant: Two houses, Shanda Adams, Rick Dane Moore, Carl Birkhead, Haley-Moore Trust, Lawyers Title of Arizona, Unknown Parties, Caddo Tribe of Oklahoma, Internal Revenue Service and Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2016cv04126
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's second amended complaint (Doc. 22 ) is dismissed without leave to amend. 2. Plaintiff's Application to Suspend Local Rules Pursuant to LRCiv 83.6 (Doc. 23 ) is denied. 3. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/9/17. (SLQ)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Plaintiff's amended complaint (Doc. 13 ) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have one more opportunity to file an amended complaint that complies fully with this order and Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. P laintiff may file a second amended complaint on or before April 28, 2017. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action without further order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint by May 1, 2017. Plaintiff's motion to order U.S. Marshal's service to serve Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. 15 ) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/10/17. (LAD)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Plaintiff's request for IFP status (Doc. 11 ) is granted. Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until February 24, 2017 to file an amended complaint. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action without further order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by February 24, 2017. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/30/17. (LAD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Priestley v. Two houses et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Priestley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two houses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanda Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Dane Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Birkhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley-Moore Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawyers Title of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddo Tribe of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?