Coleman v. Tempe, City of et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Coleman
Defendant: Tempe, City of, Edward Ouimette and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2017cv02570
Filed: August 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER that Plaintiffs' motion (Doc. 216 ), insofar as it seeks clarification of the Court's October 16, 2020 order, is GRANTED as described herein. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/13/2020. (RMV)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 *ORDER granting in part and denying in part 209 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. 1. The Estate's familial association claim, Ms. Coleman's IIED claim, and Calvin Hollins' wrongful death claim, excessive force claim, and claim against Chief Moir are DISMISSED. 2. Plaintiffs may not raise a state-created danger theory or a fitness-for-duty theory at trial. 3. Defendants' objections as to the negligent-use-of-force theory in counts 3 and 9 and Calvin Hollins' familial association claim are overruled. 4. Plaintiffs' request for sanctions is denied. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/16/2020. (RMV) *Modified to add WO on 10/16/2020 (SLQ).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear telephonically on 9/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L. Rayes to discuss setting a trial date and other pre-trial deadlines. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/13/2019. (MMO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Tempe, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Coleman
Represented By: David W Dow
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempe, City of
Represented By: Judith R Baumann
Represented By: Shelley D Cutts
Represented By: Michael Robert Niederbaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ouimette
Represented By: Judith R Baumann
Represented By: Shelley D Cutts
Represented By: Michael Robert Niederbaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?