Beitman v. Correct Clear Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Beitman
Defendant: Correct Clear Solutions, Corizon Health Incorporated and Unknown Party
Case Number: 2:2017cv03829
Filed: October 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Bridget S Bade (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 316 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - The Minute Entry (Doc. 301 ) is amended as discussed herein. The Clerk shall enter judgment for Defendants Corizon Health Incorporated, Martin Gruenberg, and Correct Care Solutions based on the jury verdicts (Doc. 303 ); for Charles L. Ryan based on the Court's Order (Doc. 301 ); for David Shinn based on these Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law; and for Bennie Rollins based on the Court's Order (Doc. 57 ). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/19/21. (DXD)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER denying 262 Motion for Rule 60(b) Relief from Judgment and 263 Joinder. Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (Doc. 243 ) is granted in part. Each party shall submit a proposed instruction by 3/3/21. The parties must confer in advance of such submission to attempt to agree on an instruction. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/17/21. (DXD)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Writ to Testify at Trial (Doc. 182 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 re BrianFinkel (Doc. 228 ) is GRANTED, and that any testimony of Brian Finkel is precluded from the trial of this matter. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 2/11/2021. (RMW)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Serve Subpoena on David Robertson (Doc. 180 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for a Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum (Doc. 227 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tha t the Clerk of Court is hereby instructed to issue a Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum to the Warden, Florence, or his duly authorized Deputy to present Michael L. Beitman #290497 for testimony via video teleconference on Tuesday 3/16/2021 at 9:00 AM. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 1/20/2021. (RMW)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 204 ) is GRANTED. Daniel M. Staren is appointed as counsel for Plaintiff; the Clerk of the Court shall send notice to Daniel M. Staren at 400 E Van Buren St #1900, Phoenix, A Z 85004, and at his email address of record in CM/ECF of this Order; Daniel M. Staren must file a notice of appearance within 10 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' request "that the Court extend all remaining dates and deadlines" in their Response (Doc. 211 ) is DENIED. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 11/10/2020. (RMW)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Telephonic Hearing for "Due Process of Law Violation" (Doc. 164 ) is DENIED without prejudice to Plaintiff raising an appropriate motion for sanctions for spoliation in the future s hould Defendants be unable to locate the x-rays. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Case Caption (Doc. 166 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall correct the caption on the docket from "Michael Lee Beitman" to &qu ot;Lee Michael Beitman." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Court to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 167 ) is DENIED without prejudice to Plaintiff raising a subsequent request for counsel after the settlement conference should the settlement conference not result in settlement and dismissal of the case. (See document for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/24/20. (SLQ)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER - The Clerk shall correct the caption on the docket to "Correct Care Solutions, et al." The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 103 ) and the motion is denied as to all defendants. David Shinn is substituted as defendant for Plaintiff's official capacity claim for injunctive relief. This action is referred to Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett to conduct a Settlement Conference. Defense counsel shall arrange for the relevant parties to jointly call within 14 days to schedule. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/17/20. (DXD)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 67 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. 59 ) is denied and the default entered by the Clerk on (Doc. 60 ) is set aside. The Motion (Doc. 61 ) is granted to the extent described herein. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff a service packet for Defendant Gruenberg. Plaintiff shall fill out the service packet for Defendant Gruenberg care of his counsel, Denise Troy, who has agreed to accept service on his behalf (D oc. 76 ). Plaintiff shall return the service packet to the Clerk's Office within 21 days. Plaintiff's Motion seeking Defendant Gruenberg's address (Doc. 69 ) is denied as moot because his counsel has agreed to accept service. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/17/19. (DXD)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 49 Report and Recommendation. The Objections (Doc. 53 ) are overruled and Defendant Rollins is dismissed for failure to serve, without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/26/19. (DXD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beitman v. Correct Clear Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Beitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Clear Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?