Sherlund v. Sessions et al

Plaintiff: William Christopher Sherlund
Defendant: Thomas E Brandon, United States of America, Jefferson B Sessions, III, United States Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigations and Christopher Wray
Case Number: 2:2018cv01126
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2018 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Thomas E Brandon, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Jefferson B Sessions, III, United States Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, United States Department of Justice, United States of America, Christopher Wray. (Smart, Adam)
August 1, 2018 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of JurisdictionMOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William Christopher Sherlund. (Victor, Marc)
July 2, 2018 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Thomas E Brandon, Jefferson B Sessions, III, Christopher Wray.(submitted by Adam R Smart) (Attachments: #1 Courtesy Copies of Journal Articles Cited in Motion)(EJA)
July 2, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER granting #12 Defendants' motion to exceed page limits. The Clerk of Court is directed to accept for filing the document lodged on the Court's docket as (Doc. #13 ). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/2/18. (EJA)
June 25, 2018 13 *Filed at (Doc. #15 ) LODGED Proposed Motion to Dismiss (12(b)(1), 12(b)(3), and 12(b)(6)) re: #12 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Thomas E Brandon, Jefferson B Sessions, III, Christopher Wray. (Attachments: #1 Courtesy Copies of Journal Articles Cited in Motion)(Smart, Adam) *Modified to correct filers on 6/26/2018 (REK). Modified on 7/2/2018 (EJA).
June 25, 2018 12 *MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss by Thomas E Brandon, Jefferson B Sessions, III, Christopher Wray. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smart, Adam) *Modified to correct filers on 6/26/2018 (REK).
May 14, 2018 11 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by William Christopher Sherlund: Certificate of Mailing re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief with Exhibits; and Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Christopher Wray, Federal Bureau of Investigation on April 25, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Victor, Marc) *Modified service date on 5/15/2018 (EJA).
May 14, 2018 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by William Christopher Sherlund: Certificate of Mailing re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief with Exhibits; and Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Jeffrey B. Sessions III, U.S. Department of Justice on April 25, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Victor, Marc)
May 14, 2018 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by William Christopher Sherlund: Certificate of Mailing re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief with Exhibits; and Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon Thomas Brandon, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives on May 2, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Victor, Marc)
May 14, 2018 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by William Christopher Sherlund: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief with Exhibits; and Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project upon United States of America on May 1, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Delivery)(Victor, Marc)
April 26, 2018 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (MSA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 25, 2018 6 SUMMONS Submitted by William Christopher Sherlund. (Victor, Marc)
April 13, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Thomas E Brandon, Jefferson B Sessions, III, Christopher Wray. (Victor, Marc) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 13, 2018 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
April 12, 2018 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15379154. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-01126-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
April 12, 2018 2 SUMMONS Submitted by William Christopher Sherlund. (Victor, Marc) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO)
April 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15379154 filed by William Christopher Sherlund. (Victor, Marc) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherlund v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E Brandon
Represented By: Adam Ryan Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Adam Ryan Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B Sessions, III
Represented By: Adam Ryan Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Represented By: Adam Ryan Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Adam Ryan Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Represented By: Adam Ryan Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Represented By: Adam Ryan Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Christopher Sherlund
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Victor
Represented By: Jody Lynn Broaddus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?