Magnotta v. Serra et al
Plaintiff: Michael J Magnotta
Defendant: Anthony M Serra, Steven A Serra, Sarah Sukta, eUnify Incorporated, Vasily Lemeilanov, Unknown Lemeilanov, Christopher S Kelsey, Lisa Serra and appLega LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02295
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 19 APPLICATION re: Plaintiff's Fee Application by Plaintiff Michael J Magnotta. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Kate L. Benveniste in Support of Plaintiff's Fee Application, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(Benveniste, Katherine)
September 4, 2018 Filing 18 Letter from Maricopa County Superior Court, indicating receipt of Remand Order #17 . (LAD)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Remand. The Clerk is directed to remand this case to the Maricopa County Superior Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing Plaintiff to submit an itemized application for fees and costs by September 10, 2018, after which Defendants may file written objections, but only to the reasonableness of the requested amount, by September 24, 2018, and Plaintiff may reply by October 8, 2018. At that time, the Court will take the matter under submission. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (ATD)
August 20, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Preclude Certain Evidence Under R. 56 (c) filed by Michael J Magnotta. (Benveniste, Katherine)
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Michael J Magnotta. (Benveniste, Katherine)
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 *MOTION to Preclude Certain Evidence Under R. 56 (c)/NOTICE of Pending Motion by Steven A Serra, eUnify Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Perry-Meier, Janae) *Modified on 8/20/2018 to change event to a pending motion and to add additional filer (ATD).
August 13, 2018 Filing 13 * Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant appLega LLC. (Sannes, Joel) * Modified to correct event and filer; attorney noticed on 8/13/2018 (LAD).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: On July 23, 2018, a deficiency notice was sent to counsel for Defendants (Doc. #3 ) advising that counsel had failed to file the Corporate Disclosure Statement required by F.R.Civ.P.7.1 and LRCiv. 7.1.1. Counsel were given 14 days to file the Corporate Disclosure Statement. Counsel for Defendant appLega LLC has failed to respond to the deficiency notice and file the required Corporate Disclosure Statement. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant appLega LLC file its Corporate Disclosure Statement not later than 10 business days [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/13/18. (MAW)
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court (by all Removing Defendants) filed by Steven A Serra. (Stanley, Brian)
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by eUnify Incorporated. (Stanley, Brian)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by eUnify Incorporated. Incorrect PDF attached. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. Please note the document you filed was completely blank. Please re-file the completed Corporate Disclosure. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 * Corporate Disclosure Statement by eUnify Incorporated. (Stanley, Brian) * Modified incorrect document filed; attorney noticed on 8/10/2018 (LAD).
August 3, 2018 Filing 7 * NOTICE re: Notice of Supplemental Filing by Steven A Serra, Lisa Serra, eUnify Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Perry-Meier, Janae) * Modified to add additional filers; attorney noticed on 8/6/2018 (LAD).
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Michael J Magnotta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Remand)(Benveniste, Katherine)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael J Magnotta identifying Corporate Parent iColligo LLC for Michael J Magnotta. (Benveniste, Katherine)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAH)
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to appLega LLC, eUnify Incorporated. (KAH)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15753259. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-02295-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAH)
July 20, 2018 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED: ANSWERS to Complaint by Christopher S Kelsey, Unknown Lemeilanov, Vasily Lemeilanov, Anthony M Serra, Lisa Serra, Steven A Serra, Sarah Sukta, appLega LLC, eUnify Incorporated. ENTERED IN DISTRICT COURT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.***(KAH)
July 20, 2018 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Verified Complaint, Application for the appointment of a receiver, Motion to seal portions of the verified complaint and exhibits, Plaintiff's Motion for accelerated and expedited discovery, and Minute Entry upon Anthony M Serra on 7/7/16 (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/11/16). Certificate of Service re: Summons, Verified Complaint, Application for the appointment of a receiver, Motion to seal portions of the verified complaint and exhibits, Plaintiff's Motion for accelerated and expedited discovery, and Minute Entry upon Steven Serra, Lisa Serra and eUnify Inc. on 7/18/16 (Originals filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/21/16). (KAH) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2016-009195, CV2016-014520. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15753259 filed by appLega LLC, Lisa Serra, Christopher S Kelsey, Vasily Lemeilanov, Steven A Serra, Sarah Sukta, eUnify Incorporated, Unknown Lemeilanov. (Perry-Meier, Janae) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magnotta v. Serra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony M Serra
Represented By: Victoria Lea Buchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A Serra
Represented By: Brian K Stanley
Represented By: Janae A Perry-Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Sukta
Represented By: Brian K Stanley
Represented By: Janae A Perry-Meier
Represented By: Stephen Jeffrey Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eUnify Incorporated
Represented By: Brian K Stanley
Represented By: Janae A Perry-Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasily Lemeilanov
Represented By: Brian K Stanley
Represented By: Janae A Perry-Meier
Represented By: Stephen Jeffrey Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lemeilanov
Represented By: Brian K Stanley
Represented By: Janae A Perry-Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher S Kelsey
Represented By: Brian K Stanley
Represented By: Janae A Perry-Meier
Represented By: Joel Eric Sannes
Represented By: Charles Wallace Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Serra
Represented By: Brian K Stanley
Represented By: Janae A Perry-Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: appLega LLC
Represented By: Brian K Stanley
Represented By: Janae A Perry-Meier
Represented By: Joel Eric Sannes
Represented By: Charles Wallace Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Magnotta
Represented By: Katherine L Benveniste
Represented By: Mark A Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?