Pinder et al v. 4716 Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Ana Cheri, Lucy Pinder, Irina Voronina and Abigail Ratchford
Defendant: Unknown Parties, 4716 Incorporated and 4716 Incorporated an Arizona Corporation doing business as Hi Liter
Case Number: 2:2018cv02503
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Raymond P Boucher on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 20, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Brian Bush on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant 4716 Incorporated. (Dow, David)
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 * NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) AMENDED filed by Plaintiffs Lucy Pinder, Abigail Ratchford, Ana Cheri, Irina Voronina. (Traulsen, Richard) * Modified to add additional filers; attorney noticed on 9/18/2018 (LAD).
September 17, 2018 Filing 14 * NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiffs Lucy Pinder, Abigail Ratchford, Ana Cheri, Irina Voronina. (Traulsen, Richard) * Modified to add additional filers; attorney noticed on 9/18/2018 (LAD).
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J. Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-2503-PHX-DJH. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for October 1, 2018 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order that Ana Cheri, Lucy Pinder, Abigail Ratchford, Irina Voronina show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/1/2018 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that 4716 Incorporated show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/1/2018 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by 4716 Incorporated.(Dow, David)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information re: Notice Of Inapplicability Of Form Nos. AO120 And AO121 Regarding Report Of An Action Involving Copyright, Trademark Or Patent Infringement by Lucy Pinder . (Traulsen, Richard) *Modified to correct event and text on 8/16/2018 (REK).
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 *Document was filed in the wrong case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 8/10/2018 (MFR).
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (MFR)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15813868. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-2503-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (MFR)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4716 Incorporated. (Dow, David) (MFR)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-054268. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15813868 filed by 4716 Incorporated. (Dow, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-F)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinder et al v. 4716 Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4716 Incorporated
Represented By: David W Dow
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4716 Incorporated an Arizona Corporation doing business as Hi Liter
Represented By: David W Dow
Represented By: Jennifer Lauren Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Cheri
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Voronina
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Ratchford
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?