Takeguma et al v. Freedom of Expression LLC et al

Plaintiff: Vivian Kindle, Rosie Jones, Heather Ray Young, Devin Justine Takeguma, Lucy Pinder, Jessica Killings and Heather Rae Young
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Freedom of Expression LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02552
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP filed by Devin Justine Takeguma. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Brian Bush but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney Richard Traulsen. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
October 4, 2018 13 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Case Management Conference Report filed by Plaintiff Devin Justine Takeguma. (Traulsen, Richard)
September 21, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Brian Bush on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 18, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Raymond P Boucher on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 17, 2018 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) AMENDED filed by Plaintiff Devin Justine Takeguma. (Traulsen, Richard)
September 17, 2018 11 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Freedom of Expression LLC. (Stone, Erik)
September 17, 2018 10 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Devin Justine Takeguma. (Traulsen, Richard)
September 6, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 10/12/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/6/2018. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 27, 2018 8 *NOTICE of Inapplicability Of Form Nos. AO120 And AO121 Regarding Report Of An Action Involving Copyright, Trademark Or Patent Infringement by Devin Justine Takeguma, Vivian Kindle, Lucy Pinder, Heather Rae Young, Jessica Killings, Rose Jones . (Traulsen, Richard) *Modified to correct filers on 8/27/2018 (SLQ).
August 17, 2018 7 Defendant ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Freedom of Expression LLC.(Stone, Erik)
August 16, 2018 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (KEP)
August 13, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/13/2018. (LFIG)
August 13, 2018 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
August 10, 2018 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15831740. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-2552-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
August 10, 2018 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Acknowledgment and Acceptance of Service re: Summons, Complaint and Plaintiff's Certificate Re: Compulsory Arbitration upon Freedom of Expression LLC on 7/26/2018. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 8/1/2018)(KEP) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 10, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom of Expression LLC. (Stone, Erik) (KEP)
August 10, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-054064. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15831740 filed by Freedom of Expression LLC. (Stone, Erik) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Takeguma et al v. Freedom of Expression LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Kindle
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Jones
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Ray Young
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Justine Takeguma
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Killings
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Rae Young
Represented By: Brian M Bush
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Raymond P Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom of Expression LLC
Represented By: Erik John Stone
Represented By: Jonathan Taylor Brinkman
Represented By: Michael E Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?