Brown et al v. Piedmonte et al

Plaintiff: Michael D Brown Investments LLC and Michael D Brown
Defendant: John A Piedmonte and Unknown Piedmonte
Case Number: 2:2018cv02585
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer in the Eastern District of Michigan. New Case Number: 2:18-cv-12699. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 28, 2018 Remark: Case transferred to the Eastern District of Michigan by electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ATD)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting the #9 Stipulation to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant John A. Piedmonte shall have until September 12, 2018, to file his responsive pleading to the Complaint (Doc. #1 -3). The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the U.S. District Court for Eastern District of Michigan, as expeditiously as is practicable and close this matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/28/2018. (ATD)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION Stipulation to Transfer Venue and Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading by John A Piedmonte. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation to Transfer and Order Granting Extension of Time to File A Responsive Pleading)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Service by Michael D Brown, Michael D Brown Investments LLC re: #7 Order . (Goulder, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/17/18. (JAMA)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 * Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant John A Piedmonte. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey) * Modified to correct document linkage on 8/17/2018 (LAD).
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Michael D Brown Investments LLC. (MFR)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by John A Piedmonte. Document is illegible. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please correct the following: Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet is blank. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15846533. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-2585-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
August 15, 2018 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Certification of Complex Case, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration and Complaint upon John A Piedmonte on 7/17/2018 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/24/2018). (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-009334. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15846533 filed by John A Piedmonte. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Piedmonte et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Piedmonte
Represented By: Zachary Ryan Fort
Represented By: Seth Troy Goertz
Represented By: Geoffrey S Kercsmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Piedmonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Brown Investments LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey J Goulder
Represented By: Javier Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey J Goulder
Represented By: Javier Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?