Barnes v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Carl Barnes
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv02636
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J. Humetewa. See attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Diane J. Humetewa on 10/16/2018. (RMW)
September 19, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Expert Testimony by Ricky Carl Barnes. (DXD)
September 19, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Service re: #4 Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP), #7 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions, #14 Certificate of Expert Testimony by Ricky Carl Barnes. (DXD)
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Service re: #4 Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP), #7 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions, #14 Certificate of Expert Testimony by Ricky Carl Barnes. (DXD)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Service re: #4 Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP), #7 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions, #14 Certificate of Expert Testimony by Ricky Carl Barnes. (DXD)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ricky Carl Barnes: Certified Mail Receipt re: summons and complaint upon VA Regional Office on 8/27/18. (EJA)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ricky Carl Barnes: Certified Mail Receipt re: summons and complaint upon Attorney General on 8/27/18. (EJA)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ricky Carl Barnes: re: summons and complaint upon U.S. Attorney's Office on 8/27/18. (EJA)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. ORDERED directing any party appearing pro se to become familiar with the Local Rules and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Such parties are advised of the free Self-Service Clinic at the courthouse. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/27/2018. (LFIG)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this case be reassigned, by lot, to another District Court Judge in the District of Arizona. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa, United States District Court Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-18-02636-PHX-DJH. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/24/18. (SLQ)
August 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General at counter to plaintiff. (BAS) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SST)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SST)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX199796. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-02636-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SST)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Ricky Carl Barnes. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (SST)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX199796 filed by Ricky Carl Barnes.(SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Carl Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?