Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. A National Solutions Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Ecoride Trucking Incorporated, OTR Capital LLC, F & A Express LLC, Viktor Express Incorporated, Trans Recovery Solutions LLC, Old Forge Services Incorporated, Cargo Solution Express Incorporated, Steely Transportation LLC, K-W Trucking Incorporated, Loves Solutions LLC, Freight Funding LLC, Eden Lines Logistics Incorporated, Tryon Trucking Incorporated, MHC Financial Services Incorporated, Black Sun Express Transport LLC, UE Line Incorporated, H&S Enterprises Incorporated, Southeastern Funding Group LLC, Next Level Enterprises LLC, Vazquez Trucking LLC, NS Express LLC, Sam Farms LLC, Mido Trucking Incorporated, Vanguard Strategic Solutions LLC, Tranzit Logistics Incorporated, R. Pulido Trucking Incorporated, Trucker Path Incorporated, Blue and Yellow Transportation Incorporated, Eagle Wings Transport Incorporated, Creekside Logistics LLC, DOT Express Incorporated, Good News Logistics Corporation, JD Factors LLC, MIB Transport LLC, McLaughlin Freight Lines Incorporated, White Eagle Transport LLC, Atlantic Nationwide Transport Incorporated, Road Carriers USA Incorporated, USA Cargo Incorporated, Richard Wolfe Trucking Incorporated, ZK Transport Incorporated, GIC Logistics Incorporated, TK Transport Incorporated, Altex Logistics Incorporated, Rockwell Industries LLC, SJ Logvin LLC, Shabad Transport Incorporated, Logisticize Limited, Alexander Winton & Associates Incorporated, Walter Flowers Trucking LLC, Gulfstream Logistics Incorporated, Run Direct Incorporated, EDO Express LLC, Rosstrans and Services LLC, Aim Transportation Services LLC, PFR Transport Corporation, Sunbelt Finance LLC, Homer Express LLC, Wallace Factoring LLC, Central Carriers Incorporated, PG Trucking LLC, First Bank and Trust, Night Star Transit Incorporated, Interstate Express Incorporated, Pro Vision Transport Incorporated, Thanica Trucking Incorporated, T-Brothers Trucking LLC, Naro Express LLC, Core Transport LLC, American Transport Services Incorporated, Advanced Commercial Capital Incorporated, CJM Financial Incorporated, Resolute Logistics LLC, Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association Incorporated, Lasifor Logistics LLC, Finger Lakes Logistics Incorporated, Nusbaum Transportation LLC, Quality Freight LLC, Maruti Logistics Limited, Delta Finance LLC, GOGA Trucking Incorporated, Fleetone Factoring LLC, Riviera Finance of Texas Incorporated, Flat National Logistics Corporation, Jag Trucking Incorporated, Ib Freight Incorporated, TBS Factoring Service LLC, Redd Transportation LLC, Riviera Finance LLC, Logic Incorporated, Strategic Transportation Solutions Incorporated, Compass Funding Solutions LLC, National Solutions Incorporated, Partners Funding Incorporated, Golden Trucking Services LLC, Foley Services Incorporated, Moldtrans Logistics Incorporated, Interstate Capital Corporation, Z Transportation Incorporated, Corefund Capital LLC, I Transport LLC, LIV Enterprises Incorporated, Tn Global Transportation, G-3 Transport LLC, Baxter, Bailey & Associates Incorporated, Jenisas Transport Incorporated, Great Plains Transport Incorporated, F&A Express LLC, Great Plains Transportation Services Incorporated, A National Solutions Incorporated, Jenisa's Transport Incorporated, First Bank and Trust a South Dakota corporation doing business as FirstLine Funding Group Incorporated, Creekside Logistics LLC an Alabama limited liability company doing business as Timber Transport LLC, Rosstrans and Services LLC a Michigan limited liability company doing business as ILC Logistics and Finger Lakes Logistics Incorporated a New York corporation doing business as Integrated Logistics & Associates
Case Number: 2:2018cv02673
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Referring Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Disbursement made in accordance with #224 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief payable to Fleetone Factoring LLC in the amount of $23,347.00, (reissued due to original check being returned for bad address) check number 02076906.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DBG)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's #224 Order, this action is hereby terminated. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/2/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 22, 2019 Disbursement made in accordance with #224 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief payable to Riviera Finance LLC in the amount of $23,814.00, check number 00749002.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DBG)
July 22, 2019 Disbursement made in accordance with #224 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief payable to Riviera Finance of Texas Inc in the amount of $1,268.00, check number 00749001.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DBG)
July 22, 2019 Disbursement made in accordance with #224 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief payable to FleetOne Factoring LLC in the amount of $23,347.00, check number 00749000.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DBG)
July 22, 2019 Disbursement made in accordance with #224 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief payable to Core Transport LLC in the amount of $3,564.00, check number 00749003.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DBG)
July 22, 2019 Disbursement made in accordance with #224 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief payable to PG Trucking LLC in the amount of $5,227.00, check number 00749005.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DBG)
July 22, 2019 Disbursement made in accordance with #224 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief payable to Shabad Tranport Inc in the amount of $1,248.00, check number 00749006.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DBG)
July 22, 2019 Disbursement made in accordance with #224 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief payable to MIB Transport LLC in the amount of $1,822.00, check number 00749004.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DBG)
July 22, 2019 Disbursement made in accordance with #224 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief payable to Trucker Path Inc in the amount of $11,800.00, check number 00749007.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DBG)
July 8, 2019 Filing 227 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Taylor H Allin. (Allin, Taylor)
July 3, 2019 Filing 226 NOTICE re: Amended Notice of Deposit by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company . (Rubacha, Edward)
July 2, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE re: Notice of Deposit by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company . (Rubacha, Edward)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting the #220 Interpleader pursuant to the parties' stipulation. ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded costs in the amount of $1,510. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall deposit $72,090 with the Clerk of Court by August 1, 2019. Upon deposit of the funds with the Court, Plaintiff is discharged from any and all liability under its Bond No. PB12237400145 and the Bond is thereby exonerated. ORDERED that upon receipt of the funds, the Clerk of Court shall disburse the funds to Defendants by check payable to Defendants and mailed to the office of their respective attorneys as set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon disbursement of the funds, this action shall be terminated. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/1/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting the #222 Joint Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default Against Core Transport, LLC. The Court finds good cause to set aside the entry of default against Core Transport and accordingly grants the motion. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/16/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
May 15, 2019 Filing 222 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Default Against Core Transport, LLC by Core Transport LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Halsey, Chase)
May 14, 2019 Filing 221 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Advanced Commercial Capital Incorporated, Aim Transportation Services LLC, Alexander Winton & Associates Incorporated, Altex Logistics Incorporated, American Transport Services Incorporated, CJM Financial Incorporated, Central Carriers Incorporated, Compass Funding Solutions LLC, Creekside Logistics LLC, DOT Express Incorporated, Delta Finance LLC, Eden Lines Logistics Incorporated, F&A Express LLC, Finger Lakes Logistics Incorporated, Flat National Logistics Corporation, Foley Services Incorporated, Freight Funding LLC, G-3 Transport LLC, Golden Trucking Services LLC, Homer Express LLC, I Transport LLC, JD Factors LLC, K-W Trucking Incorporated, LIV Enterprises Incorporated, Logisticize Limited, MHC Financial Services Incorporated, Maruti Logistics Limited, McLaughlin Freight Lines Incorporated, Mido Trucking Incorporated, Moldtrans Logistics Incorporated, NS Express LLC, Naro Express LLC, Nusbaum Transportation LLC, Resolute Logistics LLC, Southeastern Funding Group LLC, Steely Transportation LLC, Strategic Transportation Solutions Incorporated, Sunbelt Finance LLC, TBS Factoring Service LLC, TK Transport Incorporated, Trans Recovery Solutions LLC, Tranzit Logistics Incorporated, Tryon Trucking Incorporated, UE Line Incorporated, Vazquez Trucking LLC, Viktor Express Incorporated, Wallace Factoring LLC, Walter Flowers Trucking LLC, ZK Transport Incorporated. (MSA)
May 14, 2019 Filing 220 Joint MOTION for Order Granting Interpleader, for Discharge, Award of Taxable Costs and Distribution of Interpleaded Funds by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 219 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Central Carriers, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 218 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Golden Trucking Services, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 217 MOTION for Entry of Default as to American Transport Services, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 216 MOTION for Entry of Default as to CJM Financial, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 215 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Compass Funding Solutions, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 214 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Creekside Logistics, LLC dba Timber Transport, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 213 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Delta Finance, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 212 MOTION for Entry of Default as to DOT Express, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 211 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Eden Lines Logistics, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 210 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Finger Lakes Logistics, Inc. dba Integrated Logistics & Associates by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 209 MOTION for Entry of Default as to F & A Express, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 208 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Flat National Logistics Corp. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 207 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Foley Services, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 206 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Freight Funding, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 205 MOTION for Entry of Default as to G-3 Transport, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 204 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Altex Logistics, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 203 MOTION for Entry of Default as to K-W Trucking, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 202 MOTION for Entry of Default as to LIV Enterprises, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 201 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Logisticize, Ltd. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 200 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Maruti Logistics Limited by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 199 MOTION for Entry of Default as to McLaughlin Freight Lines, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 198 MOTION for Entry of Default as to MHC Financial Services, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 197 MOTION for Entry of Default as to TK Transport, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 196 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Mido Trucking, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 195 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Trans Recovery Solutions, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 194 MOTION for Entry of Default as to UE Line, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 193 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Tranzit Logistics, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 192 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sunbelt Finance, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 191 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Strategic Transportation Solutions, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 190 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Steely Transportation, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 189 MOTION for Entry of Default as to JD Factors, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 188 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Moldtrans Logistics, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 187 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Wallace Factoring, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 186 MOTION for Entry of Default as to ZK Transport, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 185 MOTION for Entry of Default as to TBS Factoring Service, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 184 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Nusbaum Transportation, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 183 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Viktor Express, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 182 MOTION for Entry of Default as to I Transport, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 181 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Homer Express, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 180 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Walter Flowers Trucking, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 179 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Vazquez Trucking, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 178 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Tryon Trucking, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 177 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Southeastern Funding Group, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 176 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Resolute Logistics, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 175 MOTION for Entry of Default as to NS Express, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 174 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Naro Express, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 173 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Aim Transportation Services, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 172 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Alexander Winton & Associates, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 171 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Advanced Commercial Capital, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Z Transportation Incorporated (a New Jersey corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 169 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Vanguard Strategic Solutions LLC (a Texas limited liability company) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Tn Global Transportation (a California corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 167 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party T-Brothers Trucking LLC (a South Dakota limited liability company) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 166 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party SJ Logvin LLC (a South Carolina limited liability company) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Run Direct Incorporated (an Illinois corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Road Carriers USA Incorporated (a California corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Redd Transportation LLC (a Michigan limited liability company) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 162 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Quality Freight LLC (an Illinois limited liability company) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party PFR Transport Corporation (a New Jersey corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association Incorporated (a Missouri nonprofit corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Night Star Transit Incorporated (a Florida corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Next Level Enterprises LLC (a Delaware limited liability company) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Logic Incorporated (a North Carolina) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Lasifor Logistics LLC (a Florida limited liability company) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Jenisa's Transport Incorporated (a New York corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Interstate Express Incorporated (a California corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Ib Freight Incorporated (an Illinois corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Gulfstream Logistics Incorporated (an Illinois corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Good News Logistics Corporation (an Illinois corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 13, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Ecoride Trucking Incorporated (an Illinois corporation) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
May 8, 2019 Filing 149 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shabad Transport Incorporated. (Halsey, Chase)
May 8, 2019 Filing 148 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PG Trucking LLC. (Halsey, Chase)
May 8, 2019 Filing 147 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by PG Trucking LLC, Shabad Transport Incorporated.(Halsey, Chase)
May 1, 2019 Filing 146 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Diane J Humetewa: This is the time set for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 5/1/2019. Posture of the case discussed. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall proceed as discussed on the record within the next two (2) weeks. LATER (off the record): IT IS ORDERED that if the parties are unable to proceed as set forth in today's proceedings, the parties shall file a Status Report with the Court three (3) weeks from this date. APPEARANCES: Edward Rubacha for Plaintiff. Andrea Landeen for Defendant Fleetone Factoring LLC. Chase Halsey for Defendants Core Transport LLC, MIB Transport LLC and Trucker Path Inc. Taylor Allin (telephonically) for Riviera Defendants. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 10:00 AM to 10:18 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
April 30, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rubacha, Edward)
April 30, 2019 Filing 144 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trucker Path Incorporated. (Halsey, Chase)
April 30, 2019 Filing 143 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MIB Transport LLC. (Halsey, Chase)
April 30, 2019 Filing 142 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Core Transport LLC. (Halsey, Chase)
April 30, 2019 Filing 141 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Core Transport LLC, MIB Transport LLC, Trucker Path Incorporated.(Halsey, Chase)
April 16, 2019 Filing 140 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Black Sun Express Transport LLC. (ESL)
April 16, 2019 Filing 139 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to USA Cargo Incorporated. (ESL)
April 16, 2019 Filing 138 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Thanica Trucking Incorporated. (ESL)
April 16, 2019 Filing 137 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rosstrans and Services LLC. (ESL)
April 16, 2019 Filing 136 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Richard Wolfe Trucking Incorporated. (ESL)
April 16, 2019 Filing 135 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to R. Pulido Trucking Incorporated. (ESL)
April 16, 2019 Filing 134 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Pro Vision Transport Incorporated. (ESL)
April 16, 2019 Filing 133 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Partners Funding Incorporated. (ESL)
April 16, 2019 Filing 132 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jag Trucking Incorporated. (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 131 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Interstate Capital Corporation. (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 130 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to H&S Enterprises Incorporated. (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 129 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Great Plains Transportation Services Incorporated. (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 128 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GOGA Trucking Incorporated. (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 127 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to GIC Logistics Incorporated. (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 126 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to EDO Express LLC. (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 125 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Eagle Wings Transport Incorporated. (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 124 AMENDED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Corefund Capital LLC. (amended to correct the attachment at Doc. #117 ) (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 123 SET ASIDE by Doc. 223 AMENDED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Core Transport LLC. (amended to correct the attachment at Doc. #116 ) (ESL) Modified on 5/16/2019 (LFIG).
April 15, 2019 Filing 122 AMENDED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Cargo Solution Express Incorporated. (amended to correct the attachment at Doc. #115 ) (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 121 AMENDED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Baxter, Bailey & Associates Incorporated. (amended to correct the attachment at Doc. #114 ) (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 120 AMENDED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Atlantic Nationwide Transport Incorporated. (amended to correct the attachment at Doc. #113 ) (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 119 AMENDED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to A National Solutions Incorporated. (amended to correct the attachment at Doc. #112 ). (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 118 AMENDED Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Blue and Yellow Transportation Incorporated. (amended to correct the attachment to Doc. #111 ) (ESL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 117 *AMENDED by Doc. #124 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Corefund Capital LLC. (ESL) Modified on 4/15/2019 due (ESL).
April 15, 2019 Filing 116 *AMENDED by Doc. #123 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Core Transport LLC. (ESL) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ESL).
April 15, 2019 Filing 115 *AMENDED by Doc. #122 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Cargo Solution Express Incorporated. (ESL) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ESL).
April 15, 2019 Filing 114 *AMENDED by Dox. #121 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Baxter, Bailey & Associates Incorporated. (ESL) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ESL).
April 15, 2019 Filing 113 *AMENDED by Doc. #120 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Atlantic Nationwide Transport Incorporated. (ESL) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ESL).
April 15, 2019 Filing 112 AMENDED by Doc. #119 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to A National Solutions Incorporated. (ESL) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ESL).
April 15, 2019 Filing 111 *AMENDED BY Doc. #118 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Blue and Yellow Transportation Incorporated. (ESL) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ESL).
April 15, 2019 Filing 110 MINUTE ORDER: The Clerk is unable to enter default on the following documents: #63 , #64 , #65 , #66 , #70 , #89 , #91 and #92 . See document for complete details. (MSA)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: On the Court's own motion, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is RESET from 4/22/2019 to 5/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa.ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/9/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
March 20, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Fleetone Factoring LLC. (Landeen, Andrea)
March 18, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) (Amended) filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rubacha, Edward)
March 4, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE re: Certificate of Mailing by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company re: #105 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon any Defendants who have not yet appeared and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/28/2019. (LFIG)
February 28, 2019 Filing 104 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J. Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-2673-PHX-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 27, 2019 Filing 103 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
February 20, 2019 Filing 95 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine: Rule 16 Case Management Conference held on 2/20/2019. IT IS ORDERED MIDP disclosures, both initial and appropriate supplements, be made within 21 days and notices of service filed. IT IS ORDERED setting a Case Management Conference for April 22, 2019 at 9:30 AM before this Court in the Special Proceedings Courtroom, 2nd Floor. See document for complete details. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 9:26 AM to 9:52 AM.(MSA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rubacha, Edward)
February 20, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Black Sun Express Transport, LLC (Amended) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 20, 2019 Filing 92 *TERMINATED BY 110 ORDER* MOTION for Entry of Default as to Z. Transportation, Inc. (Amended) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward) Modified on 4/15/2019 (MSA).
February 20, 2019 Filing 91 *TERMINATED BY 110 ORDER* MOTION for Entry of Default as to Good News Logistics Corp. (Amended) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward) Modified on 4/15/2019 (MSA).
February 20, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Tonsich Barnard on behalf of Riviera Finance LLC, Riviera Finance of Texas Incorporated. (Barnard, Catherine)
February 19, 2019 Filing 89 *TERMINATED BY 110 ORDER* MOTION for Entry of Default as to Z. Transportation, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward) Modified on 4/15/2019 (MSA).
February 19, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION for Entry of Default as to USA Cargo, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Thanica Trucking, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 86 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Rosstrans and Services, LLC dba ILC Logistics by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Richard Wolfe Trucking, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION for Entry of Default as to R. Pulido Trucking, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Pro Vision Transport, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Partners Funding, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Jag Trucking, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Interstate Capital Corporation by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for Entry of Default as to H&S Enterprises, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Great Plains Transportation Services, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Entry of Default as to GOGA Trucking, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for Entry of Default as to GIC Logistics, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION for Entry of Default as to EDO Express, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Eagle Wings Transport, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Corefund Capital, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Core Transport, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Cargo Solution Express, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 70 *TERMINATED BY 110 ORDER* MOTION for Entry of Default as to Black Sun Express Transport, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward) Modified on 4/15/2019 (MSA).
February 19, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Baxter, Bailey & Associates, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Atlantic Nationwide Transport, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for Entry of Default as to A National Solutions, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 19, 2019 Filing 66 *TERMINATED BY 110 ORDER* MOTION for Entry of Default as to Redd Transportation, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward) Modified on 4/15/2019 (MSA).
February 19, 2019 Filing 65 *TERMINATED BY 110 ORDER* MOTION for Entry of Default as to Logic, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward) Modified on 4/15/2019 (MSA).
February 19, 2019 Filing 64 *TERMINATED BY 110 ORDER* MOTION for Entry of Default as to Lasifor Logistics, LLC by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward) Modified on 4/15/2019 (MSA).
February 19, 2019 Filing 63 *TERMINATED BY #110 ORDER* MOTION for Entry of Default as to Good News Logistics Corp. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward) Modified on 4/15/2019 (MSA).
February 19, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Blue and Yellow Transportation, Inc. by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
February 15, 2019 Filing 61 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 02/12/2019 to Moldtrans Logistics, Inc. . (Rubacha, Edward)
February 7, 2019 Filing 60 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on November 21, 2018 to Compass Funding Solutions, LLC . (Rubacha, Edward)
January 31, 2019 Filing 101 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 29, 2019 Filing 99 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 29, 2019 Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for February 19, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 28, 2019 Filing 58 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order that Riviera Finance LLC, Riviera Finance of Texas Incorporated show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/19/2019 at 04:45 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
January 17, 2019 Filing 55 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 11/21/2018 to LIV Enterprises, Inc. . (Rubacha, Edward)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no motion to deposit funds or discharge Plaintiff will be considered until all non-dismissed parties have appeared and defended or have been adjudicated as defaulted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appropriate MIDP disclosures be exchanged before the reset Case Management Conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff make efforts to serve any unserved/undismissed defendants in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff pursue default against defendants as appropriate or show cause as to why served defendants who have not timely appeared should not be dismissed without prejudice. (See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 1/14/19. (SLQ)
January 9, 2019 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fleetone Factoring LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransPlatinum Service, LLC for Fleetone Factoring LLC. (Landeen, Andrea)
January 7, 2019 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riviera Finance LLC. (Allin, Taylor)
January 7, 2019 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riviera Finance of Texas Incorporated. (Allin, Taylor)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER continuing the Scheduling Conference for 2/20/2019 at 9:30 AM in Special Proceedings Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 1/4/19. (DXD)
January 4, 2019 Filing 49 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rubacha, Edward)
January 4, 2019 Filing 48 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company: Declaration of Service re: First Amended Complaint in Interpleader; Summons; Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge; Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; Order; Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons; Waiver of the Service of Summons upon Quality Freight LLC (12/14/18); Atlantic Nationwide Transport Incorporated; Z. Transportation Incorporated; Jag Trucking Incorporated (11/27/18); Corefund Capital LLC; Thanica Trucking Incorporated (11/29/18); R. Pulido Trucking Incorporated (11/24/18); Cargo Solution Express Incorporated (11/24/18); Blue and Yellow Transportation, Incorporated; USA Cargo Incorporated (11/24/18); Black Sun Express Transport LLC (11/26/18); Eagle Wings Transport Incorporated; Rosstrans and Services LLC (11/26/18); GOGA Trucking Incorporated; Gulfstream Logistics Incorporated (11/24/18); Core Transport LLC (11/26/18); GIC Logistics Incorporated (11/26/18); Compass Funding Solutions LLC (11/26/18); Road Carriers USA, Incorporated; Tn Global Transportation (11/26/18); Pro Vision Transport Incorporated (11/26/18); Partners Funding Incorporated (11/26/18); H&S Enterprises Incorporated; Great Plains Transportation Services Incorporated (11/27/18); EDO Express LLC; A National Solutions Incorporated (11/27/18); Baxter Bailey & Associates Incorporated; Interstate Capital Corporation; Richard Wolfe Trucking Incorporated (11/20/18); LIV Enterprises Incorporated (12/18/18); Logic Incorporated (11/26/18); Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association Incorporation (11/26/18); Redd Transportation LLC (11/24/18). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rubacha, Edward) *Modified service dates on 1/7/2019 (DXD).
January 4, 2019 Filing 47 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 11/21/2018 to American Transport Services, Inc.; F & A Express, LLC; Shabad Transport, Inc.; TK Transport, Inc.; Vazquez Trucking, LLC; Viktor Express, Inc. . (Rubacha, Edward)
December 26, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Fleetone Factoring LLC, Riviera Finance LLC, Riviera Finance of Texas Incorporated. (DXD)
December 21, 2018 Filing 43 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Riviera Finance LLC, Riviera Finance of Texas Incorporated.(Allin, Taylor)
December 20, 2018 Filing 46 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
December 11, 2018 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for December 17, 2018 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 10, 2018 Filing 41 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order that Fleetone Factoring LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/17/2018 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Forms)(MAP)
November 21, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party First Bank and Trust (a South Dakota corporation) terminated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rubacha, Edward)
November 21, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Sam Farms LLC (a Texas limited liability company) terminated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rubacha, Edward)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Approve Service of Process Pursuant to Ariz. R. Civ. P. 4.2(c). Philadelphia may serve the Defendants that did not return executed waiver forms pursuant to Arizona Rule of Civil Procedure 4.2(c), by first-class mail, return receipt requested, and then file the requisite affidavit to effect service on each potential claimant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 11/19/2018. (KAS)
November 19, 2018 Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER: Due to a change in courtroom location IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2019 is RESET for 1/7/2019 at 9:30 AM in Special Proceedings Courtroom, 2nd Floor, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CIS)
November 16, 2018 Filing 34 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on September 4, 2018 to Advanced Commercial Capital, Inc.; Aim Transportation Services, LLC; Alexander Winton & Associates, Inc.; Altex Logistics, Inc.; Central Carriers, Inc.; CJM Financial, Inc.; Creekside Logistics, LLC dba Timber Transport, LLC; Delta Finance, LLC; DOT Express, Inc.; Eden Lines Logistics, Inc.; Finger Lakes Logistics, Inc. dba Integrated Logistics & Associates; Flat National Logistics Corp.; Fleetone Factoring, LLC; Foley Services, Inc.; Freight Funding, LLC; G-3 Transport, LLC; Golden Trucking Services, LLC; Homer Express, LLC; I Transport, LLC; JD Factors, LLC; K-W Trucking, Inc.; Logisticize, Ltd.; Maruti Logistics Limited; McLaughlin Freight Lines, Inc.; MHC Financial Services, Inc.; MIB Transport, LLC; Mido Trucking, Inc.; Naro Express, LLC; NS Express, LLC; Nusbaum Transportation, LLC; PG Trucking, LLC; Resolute Logistics, LLC; Southeastern Funding Group, LLC; Steely Transportation, LLC; Strategic Transportation Solutions, Inc.; TBS Factoring Service, LLC; Trans Recovery Solutions, LLC; Tranzit Logistics, Inc.; Wallace Factoring, LLC; Walter Flowers Trucking, LLC; White Eagle Transport, LLC; ZK Transport, Inc. . (Rubacha, Edward)
November 16, 2018 Filing 33 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on September 4, 2018 to Trucker Path, Inc. (nka Instapay Flexible, LLC) . (Rubacha, Edward)
November 16, 2018 Filing 32 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on October 25, 2018 to Riviera Finance of Texas, Inc.; Riviera Finance, LLC . (Rubacha, Edward)
November 16, 2018 Filing 31 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on October 22, 2018 to UE Line, Inc. . (Rubacha, Edward)
November 16, 2018 Filing 30 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on October 23, 2018 to Sunbelt Finance, LLC; Tryon Trucking, Inc. . (Rubacha, Edward)
November 15, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Approve Service of Process Pursuant to Ariz.R.Civ.P. 4.2(c) re: #10 MOTION to Approve Service of Process Pursuant to Ariz.R.Civ.P. 4.2(c) re: #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 1/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 11/07/2018. (KAS)
November 6, 2018 Filing 27 Defendant FleetOne Factoring, LLC ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Fleetone Factoring LLC.(Landeen, Andrea) *Modified to link document on 11/6/2018 (KAS).
November 6, 2018 Filing 26 *Defendant FleetOne Factoring, LLC ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Fleetone Factoring LLC.(Landeen, Andrea) *Modified to reflect incorrect .pdf attached. Correct document filed at Doc. #27 . Attorney called to notify on 11/6/2018 (KAS).
September 21, 2018 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Party Dismissal #24 , Loves Solutions LLC is dismissed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
September 19, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Loves Solutions LLC (an Oklahoma limited liability company) terminated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rubacha, Edward)
September 18, 2018 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Party Dismissal #22 , Defendant Old Forge Services terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
September 18, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party Old Forge Services Incorporated (an Ohio corporation) terminated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rubacha, Edward)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER approving the #17 Stipulation of Dismissal - 1. OTR Capital, LLC, individually and as assignee of Traveloko, Inc. and Mega Trucking, LLC, is dismissed from this interpleader action with prejudice as to all claims. 2. OTR Capital, LLC, individually and as assignee of Traveloko, Inc. and Mega Trucking, LLC, is prohibited from instituting or prosecuting any action against Philadelphia on Surety Bond No. PBI12237400145 at issue in this action or against any funds interpleaded with the Court related thereto. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee for Honorable Deborah M. Fine, United States Magistrate Judge, on 9/13/18. (LAD)
September 13, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of defendant White Eagle Transport LLC only #19 , party is dismissed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Party White Eagle Transport LLC (a Texas limited liability company) terminated. (Rubacha, Edward)
September 11, 2018 Filing 18 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to OTR Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
September 11, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal (with prejudice) by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
September 7, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Certificate of Mailing by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company re: #7 Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP), #15 Summons Issued, 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, #13 Amended Complaint, #5 Summons Issued . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rubacha, Edward)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Great Plains Transportation Services Incorporated. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 4, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Submitted by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rubacha, Edward)
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rubacha, Edward)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #10 Motion to Approve Service of Process Pursuant to Ariz. R. Civ. P. 4.2. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 8/30/18. (LAD)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Approve Service of Process Pursuant to Ariz.R.Civ.P. 4.2(c) re: #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubacha, Edward)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Errata re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rubacha, Edward)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (KEP)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15877637. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M. Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-2673-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rubacha, Edward) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(KEP)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rubacha, Edward)(KEP)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15877637 filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Rubacha, Edward) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. A National Solutions Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecoride Trucking Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTR Capital LLC
Represented By: Samantha L Tzoberi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F & A Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viktor Express Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Recovery Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Forge Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargo Solution Express Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steely Transportation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-W Trucking Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loves Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freight Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eden Lines Logistics Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tryon Trucking Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHC Financial Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Sun Express Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UE Line Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&S Enterprises Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Funding Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Next Level Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vazquez Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NS Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mido Trucking Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Strategic Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tranzit Logistics Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Pulido Trucking Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trucker Path Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B Murphy
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue and Yellow Transportation Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Wings Transport Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creekside Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOT Express Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good News Logistics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD Factors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIB Transport LLC
Represented By: Richard B Murphy
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLaughlin Freight Lines Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Eagle Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Nationwide Transport Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road Carriers USA Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Cargo Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Wolfe Trucking Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZK Transport Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIC Logistics Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Transport Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altex Logistics Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Industries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJ Logvin LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shabad Transport Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B Murphy
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logisticize Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Winton & Associates Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Flowers Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfstream Logistics Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Run Direct Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDO Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosstrans and Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aim Transportation Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFR Transport Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Factoring LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Carriers Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PG Trucking LLC
Represented By: Richard B Murphy
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bank and Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Night Star Transit Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Express Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Vision Transport Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thanica Trucking Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Brothers Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naro Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Transport LLC
Represented By: Richard B Murphy
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Transport Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Commercial Capital Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJM Financial Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolute Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lasifor Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finger Lakes Logistics Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nusbaum Transportation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Freight LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maruti Logistics Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOGA Trucking Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleetone Factoring LLC
Represented By: Alissa Brice Castaneda
Represented By: Andrea H Landeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riviera Finance of Texas Incorporated
Represented By: Catherine Tonsich Barnard
Represented By: Taylor H Allin
Represented By: Brian Thomas DelGatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flat National Logistics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jag Trucking Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ib Freight Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS Factoring Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redd Transportation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riviera Finance LLC
Represented By: Catherine Tonsich Barnard
Represented By: Taylor H Allin
Represented By: Brian Thomas DelGatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logic Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Transportation Solutions Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Funding Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Solutions Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partners Funding Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Trucking Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foley Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moldtrans Logistics Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z Transportation Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corefund Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIV Enterprises Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tn Global Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G-3 Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter, Bailey & Associates Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenisas Transport Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Plains Transport Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F&A Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Plains Transportation Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A National Solutions Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenisa's Transport Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bank and Trust a South Dakota corporation doing business as FirstLine Funding Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creekside Logistics LLC an Alabama limited liability company doing business as Timber Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosstrans and Services LLC a Michigan limited liability company doing business as ILC Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finger Lakes Logistics Incorporated a New York corporation doing business as Integrated Logistics & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward Rubacha, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?