Acosta v. KLASS Services Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: R Alexander Acosta
Defendant: KLASS Services Incorporated, Adam Sheppard and Kent Sheppard
Case Number: 2:2018cv02735
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to KLASS Services Incorporated. (MMO)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/17/2018. (MMO)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to #1 Complaint by KLASS Services Incorporated, Adam Sheppard, Kent Sheppard.(Hertzog, Erin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 * SERVICE EXECUTED filed by R Alexander Acosta: Proof of Service re: Summons upon KLASS Services Incorporated, Adam Sheppard and Kent Sheppard on 09/20/2018. (Jaberg, Danielle) * Modified to add text on 10/10/2018 (LAD).
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/30/2018. (MMO)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff R Alexander Acosta. (Jaberg, Danielle)
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by R Alexander Acosta. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please re-file corrected, current automated civil cover sheet document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to KLASS Services Incorporated, Adam Sheppard, Kent Sheppard. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-02735-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by R Alexander Acosta. (Jaberg, Danielle) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAC)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by R Alexander Acosta. (Jaberg, Danielle) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. KLASS Services Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Marc Anthony Pilotin
Represented By: Danielle Lee Jaberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLASS Services Incorporated
Represented By: Erin A Hertzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Sheppard
Represented By: Erin A Hertzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Sheppard
Represented By: Erin A Hertzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?