CPF Vaseo Associates LLC v. Epicenter Partners LLC et al
Appellee: ROI Properties Incorporated, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Bruce Gray, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Emerald Equities LLC and East of Epicenter LLC
Appellant: CPF Vaseo Associates LLC
Undetermined: Arizona State Land Department, Barbara A Gray, Thomas Title & Escrow, Abrams Capital Partners II LP, Maricopa County Treasurer, Abrams Capital Partners I LP, Joseph E Meyer, Jr., Abrams Capital LLC, Desert Ridge Community Association, BV Lending LLC, Abrams Capital Management LP, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Constantino Flores, Stuart S Bingham, Swiss Desert LLC, Abrams Capital Management LLC, Bruce W Gray, Lisa Ann Zurcher-Meyer, J.E. Meyer Investments Incorporated and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Trustee: United States Trustees Office
Case Number: 2:2018cv02857
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing filed by East of Epicenter LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Bruce Gray, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC. (Lacey, Alisa)
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 * Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response To Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Appellants' Second Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing)(Burgess, Todd) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 11/5/2018 (LAD).
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Paul Michael Hilkert. Reason for return: moved, left no address. Document number #11 . (EJA)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE from the Bankruptcy Court that the certificate that the Record on Appeal is complete cannot be filed for the reason(s) stated in the attached document. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time #10 . Appellant's response to Appellees' Motion to Dismiss is due no later than November 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/19/2018. (LMR)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing) by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Stipulation For Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction)(Burgess, Todd)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Paul Michael Hilkert. Reason for return: unable to forward. Document numbers #2 and #3 . (SLQ)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing) by East of Epicenter LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Bruce Gray, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simpson, Christopher)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC identifying Corporate Parent Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC for Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC. (Stuart, John)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (Burgess, Todd)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROI Properties Incorporated. (Rodgers, Stuart)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Abrams Capital LLC, Abrams Capital Management LLC, Abrams Capital Management LP, Abrams Capital Partners I LP, Abrams Capital Partners II LP, BV Lending LLC, CPF Vaseo Associates LLC, Desert Ridge Community Association, East of Epicenter LLC, Emerald Equities LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, J.E. Meyer Investments Incorporated, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, ROI Properties Incorporated, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Swiss Desert LLC, Thomas Title & Escrow. (REK)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of Ninth Circuit by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CPF Vaseo Associates LLC v. Epicenter Partners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ROI Properties Incorporated
Represented By: Stuart B Rodgers
Represented By: Paul Michael Hilkert
Represented By: William John Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC
Represented By: Stuart B Rodgers
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Paul Michael Hilkert
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Represented By: Anthony P Cali
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Epicenter Partners LLC
Represented By: Stuart B Rodgers
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Paul Michael Hilkert
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Represented By: Anthony P Cali
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bruce Gray
Represented By: John Neil Stuart
Represented By: Daniel G Dowd
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC
Represented By: Stuart B Rodgers
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Paul Michael Hilkert
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Represented By: Anthony P Cali
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gray Meyer Fannin LLC
Represented By: Stuart B Rodgers
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Paul Michael Hilkert
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Represented By: Anthony P Cali
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC
Represented By: John Neil Stuart
Represented By: Daniel G Dowd
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Emerald Equities LLC
Represented By: Nicole Maroulakos Goodwin
Represented By: E Jeffrey Walsh
Represented By: David Dennis Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: East of Epicenter LLC
Represented By: Stuart B Rodgers
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Paul Michael Hilkert
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Represented By: Anthony P Cali
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CPF Vaseo Associates LLC
Represented By: Todd Andrew Burgess
Represented By: Lindsi Michelle Weber
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Arizona State Land Department
Represented By: Dean Christian Waldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Barbara A Gray
Represented By: James E Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Thomas Title & Escrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Abrams Capital Partners II LP
Represented By: Marvin Christopher Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Maricopa County Treasurer
Represented By: Klaus Peter Muthig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Abrams Capital Partners I LP
Represented By: Marvin Christopher Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Joseph E Meyer, Jr.
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Represented By: John Matthew Derstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Abrams Capital LLC
Represented By: Marvin Christopher Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Desert Ridge Community Association
Represented By: Michael Walter Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: BV Lending LLC
Represented By: Vincent P Slusher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Abrams Capital Management LP
Represented By: Marvin Christopher Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Stinson Leonard Street LLP
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Constantino Flores
Represented By: Dawn Marie Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Stuart S Bingham
Represented By: Joseph M Vanleuven
Represented By: Neal Hait Bookspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Swiss Desert LLC
Represented By: Dale C Schian
Represented By: Scott Robert Goldberg
Represented By: Grant L Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Abrams Capital Management LLC
Represented By: Marvin Christopher Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Bruce W Gray
Represented By: James E Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Lisa Ann Zurcher-Meyer
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Represented By: John Matthew Derstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: J.E. Meyer Investments Incorporated
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Represented By: John Matthew Derstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Patrick A Clisham
Represented By: Scott B Cohen
Represented By: Steven N Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustees Office
Represented By: Edward Kenneth Bernatavicius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?