VFS Leasing Company et al v. Silverado Stages Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Volvo Financial Services and VFS Leasing Company
Defendant: Jim and Sharron Galusha Revocable Trust Dated August 9, 2012, Silverado Stages AZ LLC, Silverado Stages WY LLC, Silverado Stages Incorporated, Michelangelo Leasing, Silverado Stages SC LLC, James R Galusha, Charter Services LLC, Sharron R Galusha, Silverado Stages CC LLC, Silverado Stages NC LLC and Silverado Stages NV LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02894
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Arizona District Court
0 Judge: Bridget S Bade
1 Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 30 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's #29 Motion to Lift Stay. The Clerk of Court is directed to lift the stay of this litigation with respect to Defendants Silverado Stages WY, LLC, and the Galushas. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/6/2018. (ATD)
October 22, 2018 29 MOTION to Lift Stay of Litigation by VFS Leasing Company, Volvo Financial Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Carter, W)
October 19, 2018 28 *Notice of Voluntary Partial Dismissal of (1) the complaint as against bankrupt defendants without prejudice; and (2) the fraud claim as against all defendants except James R. and Sharron R. Galusha individually and as trustees of the Jim and Sharron Galusha Revocable Trust, dated August 9, 2012 by VFS Leasing Company, Volvo Financial Services . (Nickel, Mark) Modified on 10/22/2018 (SLQ).
October 19, 2018 27 Featured Case ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter is stayed for six months. This case will be dismissed without further order of the Court on April 19, 2019 unless, prior thereto, a motion to continue the stay is filed, or the Court is advised that the bankruptcy stay has been lifted and the parties are ready to proceed with this case. Alternatively, Plaintiffs may dismiss the Bankrupt Defendants and thereafter move to lift the stay in light of that dismissal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating all hearings and terminating all pending motions, without prejudice to reinstating those motions if the stay is lifted and the parties proceed with this case [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/19/18. (MAW)
October 16, 2018 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #23 Response to Motion filed by VFS Leasing Company, Volvo Financial Services. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ATD)
October 16, 2018 25 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/16/2018. Discussion held regarding the scope of the stay. After hearing from the parties, the Court rules as follows: The deadline for Defendants' to respond to the 1st Amended Complaint is extended to 1 week after the Court rules on the scope of the automatic stay. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Mark Nickel and Kent Carter for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Cody Jess and Brittany Neel for Defendants. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 10:20 AM to 10:31 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
October 15, 2018 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #21 Emergency MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Telephonic status conference to Determine Scope of the Automatic Stay filed by James R Galusha, Sharron R Galusha, Jim and Sharron Galusha Revocable Trust Dated August 9, 2012, Silverado Stages WY LLC. (Jess, Cody)
October 15, 2018 23 RESPONSE to Motion re: #21 Emergency MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Telephonic status conference to Determine Scope of the Automatic Stay filed by VFS Leasing Company, Volvo Financial Services. (Carter, W)
October 9, 2018 22 Featured Case ORDER granting #21 Emergency Motion to set Telephonic Status Conference to Determine Scope of the Automatic Stay. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Counsel for Defendant shall make the necessary arrangements for the conference call. All parties participating in the conference call shall do so via a landline only. The use of cellular phones will not be permitted. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/9/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO)
October 9, 2018 21 Emergency MOTION for Hearing or Conference re: Telephonic status conference to Determine Scope of the Automatic Stay by James R Galusha, Sharron R Galusha, Jim and Sharron Galusha Revocable Trust Dated August 9, 2012, Silverado Stages WY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Setting Telephonic Status Conference)(Jess, Cody)
October 8, 2018 20 *NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Charter Services LLC, Michelangelo Leasing, Silverado Stages AZ LLC, Silverado Stages CC LLC, Silverado Stages Incorporated, Silverado Stages NC LLC, Silverado Stages NV LLC, Silverado Stages SC LLC, Silverado Stages WY LLC. (Jess, Cody) *Modified on 10/9/2018 to remove filers (ATD).
October 5, 2018 19 NOTICE re: Service by VFS Leasing Company, Volvo Financial Services re: #17 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Carter, W)
October 3, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/2/2018. (MMO)
October 3, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/2/2018. (MMO)
October 3, 2018 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by VFS Leasing Company, Volvo Financial Services: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon James Galusha individually and as trustee, and Sharron Galusha, individually and as trustee on 9/20/18. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of James Galusha individually and as trustee)(Carter, W)
October 2, 2018 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Douglas L. Rayes. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-2894-PHX-DLR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 2, 2018 14 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 28, 2018 12 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by VFS Leasing Company, Volvo Financial Services . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carter, W)
September 28, 2018 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Volvo Financial Services, VFS Leasing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-45, #3 Exhibit 46-64)(Carter, W)
September 26, 2018 10 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by VFS Leasing Company, Volvo Financial Services: Affidavits of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Charter Services, LLC, Michaelangelo Leasing, Inc., Silverado Stages AZ, LLC, Silverado Stages, Inc., Silverado Stages NC, LLC, Silverado Stages CC, LLC on 9/20/2018 and Silverado Stages SC, LLC on 9/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service of Complaint and Summons on Michaelangelo Leasing, Inc., #2 Affidavit Service of Complaint and Summons on Silverado Stages AZ, LLC, #3 Affidavit Service of Complaint and Summons onSilverado Stages, Inc., #4 Affidavit Service of Complaint and Summons onSilverado Stages NC, LLC, #5 Affidavit Service of Complaint and Summons onSilverado Stages CC, LLC, #6 Affidavit Service of Complaint and Summons on Silverado Stages SC, LLC)(Carter, W) *Modified text on 9/27/2018 (REK).
September 25, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody James Jess on behalf of Charter Services LLC, James R Galusha, Sharron R Galusha, Jim and Sharron Galusha Revocable Trust Dated August 9, 2012, Michelangelo Leasing, Silverado Stages AZ LLC, Silverado Stages CC LLC, Silverado Stages Incorporated, Silverado Stages NC LLC, Silverado Stages NV LLC, Silverado Stages SC LLC, Silverado Stages WY LLC. (Jess, Cody)
September 19, 2018 8 Summons Reissued as to Charter Services LLC, James R Galusha, Sharron R Galusha, Jim and Sharron Galusha Revocable Trust Dated August 9, 2012, Michelangelo Leasing, Silverado Stages AZ LLC, Silverado Stages CC LLC, Silverado Stages Incorporated, Silverado Stages NC LLC, Silverado Stages NV LLC, Silverado Stages SC LLC, Silverado Stages WY LLC. (BAS)
September 18, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for W Kent Carter on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 13, 2018 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
September 13, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to VFS Leasing Company, Volvo Financial Services. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 13, 2018 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15954832. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bridget S Bade. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-02894-PHX-BSB. Magistrate Election form attached. (BAC)
September 13, 2018 4 SUMMONS Submitted by VFS Leasing Company, Volvo Financial Services. (Nickel, Mark) (BAC)
September 13, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VFS Leasing Company. (BAC)
September 13, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VFS Leasing Company. (BAC)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-15954832 filed by Volvo Financial Services, VFS Leasing Company. (Nickel, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VFS Leasing Company et al v. Silverado Stages Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim and Sharron Galusha Revocable Trust Dated August 9, 2012
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverado Stages AZ LLC
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverado Stages WY LLC
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverado Stages Incorporated
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelangelo Leasing
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverado Stages SC LLC
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Galusha
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Services LLC
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharron R Galusha
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverado Stages CC LLC
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverado Stages NC LLC
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverado Stages NV LLC
Represented By: Cody James Jess
Represented By: Brittany Marie Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volvo Financial Services
Represented By: Mark Andrew Nickel
Represented By: Gregory W Seibt
Represented By: W Kent Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VFS Leasing Company
Represented By: Mark Andrew Nickel
Represented By: Gregory W Seibt
Represented By: W Kent Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?