United States of America v. $27,100.00 in US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $27,100.00 in US Currency
Case Number: 2:2018cv02963
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Mark J. Wenker appearing for United States of America. Attorney Jeffrey Ryan Borup terminated. . (Wenker, Mark)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Arrest of Defendant $27,100.00 by USMS on September 25, 2018 by United States of America . (Borup, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 WARRANT for Arrest In Rem issued. (MSA)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. The deadline for completing discovery is six (6) months from the date both an answer and claim are filed, and 2. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is seven (7) months from the date both an answer and claim are filed. If this matter is stayed pending related criminal proceedings, a written joint status report shall be due every six (6) months from the date of the Order to stay case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to comply with deadlines herein set shall result in dismissal of the case pursuant to LRCiv 41.1 of the Local Rules of Practice. Plaintiff shall serve Claimant with a copy of this Order within 15 days of any appearance. Signed by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow on 9/20/2018. (RMW)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-02963-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Borup, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification of DEA SA Neal)(BAR) Modified on 9/20/2018, file date changed from 9/20/2018 to 9/19/2018 (BAR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $27,100.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $27,100.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Borup
Represented By: Mark James Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?