ThermoLife International LLC v. Neogenis Labs Incorporated
Plaintiff: ThermoLife International LLC
Defendant: Neogenis Labs Incorporated and Neogenis Labs Incorporated doing business as HumanN, a Texas corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv02980
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT REGARDING SERVICE by ThermoLife International LLC. (Collins, Gregory)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FROM CHAMBERS: On or before November 16, 2018, plaintiff will please follow up with defendant to get a waiver filed or shall effect service conventionally. (EJA)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT REGARDING SERVICE by ThermoLife International LLC. (Collins, Gregory)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FROM CHAMBERS: A review of the docket indicates that proofs of service concerning the defendants are lacking. Plaintiff shall either file proofs of service by seven days from the entry of this order or file a status report concerning service of the complaint on defendants. (EJA)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge H. Russel Holland. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-2980-PHX-HRH. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for October 29, 2018 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order that ThermoLife International LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/29/2018 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by ThermoLife International LLC. (Rogers, Cara)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Neogenis Labs Incorporated. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO121)(MCO)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15984360. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-2980-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by ThermoLife International LLC. (Collins, Gregory) (MCO)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ThermoLife International LLC. (Collins, Gregory) (MCO)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15984360 filed by ThermoLife International LLC. (Collins, Gregory) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ThermoLife International LLC v. Neogenis Labs Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neogenis Labs Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neogenis Labs Incorporated doing business as HumanN, a Texas corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ThermoLife International LLC
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Represented By: Cara Molly Louise Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?