Petramala v. Voth et al
Plaintiff: Michael Petramala
Defendant: Richard J Voth, Jr., Arthur Grigoryan, Unknown Parties, H2O Properties LLC, Larry Douglas, Richard Connelly, H2O Apartments LLC and Richard Connolly
Case Number: 2:2018cv03000
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Granting #44 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. IT IS ORDERED dismissing the above-captioned matter with prejudice, each side to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/13/20. (GMP)
February 13, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice by Richard Connolly, Larry Douglas, H2O Apartments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Alexis)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion allowing Plaintiff to appear telephonically at the 2/21/2020 oral argument by calling 602-322-7540. Ordered by Judge Susan M Brnovich.(TCA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
January 31, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Telephonic Oral Argument as a Reasonable Accommodation by Michael Petramala. (EJA)
January 27, 2020 Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER as to #29 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #36 MOTION to Order Alternative Service Due to Defendants Evading Service of Process : A Motion Hearing is set for 30 minutes on 2/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
December 18, 2019 Filing 40 SUPPLEMENT to #36 MOTION to Order Alternative Service Due to Defendants Evading Service of Process by Plaintiff Michael Petramala. (EJA)
December 4, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #36 MOTION to Order Alternative Service Due to Defendants Evading Service of Process filed by Michael Petramala. (EJA)
December 2, 2019 Filing 38 Service Returned Unexecuted: summons/complaint/order as to H2O Apartments LLC. (EJA)
December 2, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re: #36 MOTION to Order Alternative Service Due to Defendants Evading Service of Process filed by Richard Connolly, Larry Douglas, H2O Apartments LLC. (Wood, Alexis)
November 18, 2019 Filing 36 *MOTION to Order Alternative Service Due to Defendants Evading Service of Process and REPLY to Response to Motion re: #30 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Michael Petramala. (SLQ) (4 pages). *Modified to add motion on 12/2/2019 (SLQ).
November 15, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Errata re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Richard Connelly.. (Wood, Alexis)
November 14, 2019 Filing 34 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss Case, RESPONSE to #30 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Richard Connolly, Larry Douglas, H2O Apartments LLC. (Wood, Alexis) *Modified on 11/15/2019 to add and correct document linkage (MSA).
November 13, 2019 Filing 33 Service Returned Unexecuted: summons/complaint as to Richard Connolly. (EJA)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting the Motion and extending Defendants deadline to file a reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss to November 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 11/7/2019. (TCA)
November 5, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time file reply re motion to dismiss by Richard Connelly, Larry Douglas, H2O Apartments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting motion to extend time)(Wood, Alexis)
October 30, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion #29 Motion to Dismiss Case, MOTION to Amend Order to Extend Service Time if Needed by Michael Petramala. (EJA)
October 28, 2019 Filing 29 *MOTION to Dismiss Case by Richard Connolly, Larry Douglas, H2O Apartments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Alexis) *Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c). Attorney notified on 10/29/2019 (EJA).
October 9, 2019 Filing 28 SERVICE EXECUTED: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: Complaint and Summons upon Larry Douglas on 10/07/2019. (REK)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Plaintiff's Motion. Service by waiver or service of the summons and complaint shall be at government expense on the defendant bythe U.S. Marshal or his authorized representative. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. #24 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court by July 1, 2019. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on a Defendant(s) by September 13, 2019, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Service Packet Letter, #2 Service Packet, #3 Summons, #4 Service Packet, #5 Summons, #6 Service Packet, #7 Summons, #8 2nd Amended Complaint)(EJA)
May 30, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Amend Order Granting Service by Marshal, NOTICE re: Service of Summonses and Second Amended Complaint by Michael Petramala. (DXD)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to reopen this action. The for service is July 22, 2019. If Plaintiff does not file an affidavit of service on or before that date, the Second Amended Complaint will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/22/19. (EJA)
May 21, 2019 Filing 24 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Larry Douglas, Richard Connolly, H2O Apartments LLC filed by Michael Petramala.(EJA)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #8 is dismissed with leave to file a Second Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is entered. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not file a Second Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is entered, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action without further order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff elects to file a Second Amended Complaint, it may not be served until and unless the Court issues an Order screening the amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 5/01/2019. (REK)
April 26, 2019 Filing 22 Service Returned Unexecuted: summons/order/complaint as to Richard Connolly. (EJA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: summons/complaint/order upon Larry Douglas on 4/10/19. (EJA)
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 Service Returned Unexecuted: summons/complaint/order as to H2O Properties LLC. (EJA)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Reconsider Dismissal re: #18 Order Dismissing Case, MOTION for Extension of Time for Service by Michael Petramala. (GMP)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Dismissing this case without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED any pending motions are dismissed as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 4/2/19. (GMP)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's motion, service by waiver or service of the summons and complaint shall be at government expense on the defendant by the U.S. Marshal or his authorized representative. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Amended Complaint (Doc. #8 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court by March 29, 2019. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Service Letter, #3 Service Packet, #4 Service Packet, #5 Service Packet)(EJA)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: On the Court's own motion, IT IS ORDERED amending the Court's order (Doc. 15) to reflect that service must be completed by March 29, 2019. The case will be dismissed on or after that date without further notice unless proof of service is filed before March 29, 2019. Ordered by Judge Susan M. Brnovich. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 *AMENDED by (Doc. #17 ) ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's motion, service by waiver or service of the summons and complaint shall be at government expense on the defendant by the U.S. Marshal or his authorized representative. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. #1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 1/28/19. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Service Packet Letter, #3 Service Packet, #4 Service Packet, #5 Service Packet)(EJA) Modified on 2/6/2019 (EJA).
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Service by Appointed Marshal by Michael Petramala. (EJA)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment #12 is DENIED. There is no proof of service in the court file and default cannot be obtained without proof of service that is in compliance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.Pro. Ordered by Judge Susan M Brnovich.(TCA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment and Proposed Judgment by Michael Petramala. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(EJA)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-3000-PHX-SMB. Any deadlines and/or hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Michael Petramala. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (EJA)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael Petramala. NOTE: Same as (Doc. #8 ). (EJA)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Richard Connelly, Larry Douglas, H2O Properties LLC, Unknown Parties filed by Michael Petramala.(EJA)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/26/2018. (MMO)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/26/2018. (MMO)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MSA)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MSA)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-03000-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MSA)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Michael Petramala. (MSA)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Petramala.(MSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petramala v. Voth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J Voth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Grigoryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H2O Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Douglas
Represented By: Josh Michael Snell
Represented By: Alexis Marie Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Connelly
Represented By: Alexis Marie Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H2O Apartments LLC
Represented By: Josh Michael Snell
Represented By: Alexis Marie Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Connolly
Represented By: Josh Michael Snell
Represented By: Alexis Marie Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Petramala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?