United States of America v. $18,970.00 in US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $18,970.00 in US Currency
Claimant: Frank Daniels Martinez
Case Number: 2:2018cv03011
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by United States of America. (Wenker, Mark)
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (REK)
November 8, 2018 Filing 13 CLAIM for Seized Property by Frank Daniels Martinez. (REK)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Mark J. Wenker appearing for United States of America. Attorney Jeffrey Ryan Borup terminated. . (Borup, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Arrest by United States of America . (Borup, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett added. Judge Steven P Logan no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-18-3011-PHX-ESW. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/5/18. (MAP)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Service of Verified Complaint by United States of America . (Borup, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: The deadline for completing discovery is six (6) months from the date an answer is filed. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is seven (7) months from the date an answer is filed. If this matter is stayed pending related criminal proceedings, a written joint status report shall be due every six (6) months from the date of the order to stay the case. Failure to comply with the deadlines herein shall result in dismissal of this case. Plaintiff shall serve Claimant with a copy of this Order within fifteen (15) days of any appearance. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/03/2018. (REK)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction forms are not to be e-filed. DO NOT REFILE. The deficiency has been addressed by the clerk. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM issued. (REK)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 *NOTICE re: Consent for a U.S. Magistrate Judge by United States of America (Borup, Jeffrey) *Modified on 9/27/2018 to Reflect Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed. Counsel Notified (MAP)*.
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff United States of America. (Borup, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-3011-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Borup, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $18,970.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $18,970.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeffrey Ryan Borup
Represented By: Mark James Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Frank Daniels Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?