Bogus v. GEICO Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Justin Bogus
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Unknown Party, GEICO Indemnity Company, Danielle Trach and Unknown Trach
Case Number: 2:2018cv03042
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Danielle Trach, John Doe Trach. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 24, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by Justin Bogus. (Henry, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Submitted by Justin Bogus. (Henry, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Summons Submitted filed by Justin Bogus. Please submit one summons for each defendant. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Justin Bogus. (Henry, Michael)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by GEICO Indemnity Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 Defendant GEICO'S ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by GEICO Indemnity Company.(King, Daniel)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Justin Bogus . (Henry, Michael)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Amended Complaint filed by Justin Bogus. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Justin Bogus.(Henry, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for December 14, 2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. (See document for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/27/18. (SLQ)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on November 27, 2018. (See order for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/27/18. (SLQ)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16005306. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-3042-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Gerber, Sanford)(KEP)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-010882. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16005306 filed by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Gerber, Sanford) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bogus v. GEICO Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Bogus
Represented By: Michael Justin Henry
Represented By: Geoffrey Mark Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Sanford Keith Gerber
Represented By: Daniel Oliver King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Trach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Trach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?