Beahm v. Whitestone Anthem Marketplace LLC et al

Plaintiff: Teresa J Beahm
Defendant: Whitestone Anthem Marketplace LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2018cv03236
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint Paragraphs 50-53 filed by Whitestone Anthem Marketplace LLC. (Gorman, Patrick)
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-3236-PHX-SMB. Any deadlines and/or hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
December 5, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whitestone Anthem Marketplace LLC. (Gorman, Patrick)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Paragraphs 50-53 of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Teresa J Beahm. (Morey, Lorraine)
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Whitestone Anthem Marketplace LLC. (Gorman, Patrick)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 *MOTION to Strike Paragraphs 50-53 re: #1 Complaint by Whitestone Anthem Marketplace LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting motion to strike)(Gorman, Patrick) *Modified text on 11/19/2018 (REK).
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Whitestone Anthem Marketplace LLC.(Gorman, Patrick)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/05/2018. (REK)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 11/16/2018 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 11/05/2018. (REK)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Whitestone Anthem Marketplace LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gorman, Patrick)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Teresa J Beahm: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Consent to Magistrate, Notice to Parties, MIDPP General Order upon Whitestone Anthem Marketplace, LLC on 10/12/2018. (Morey, Lorraine)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on January 9, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/11/2018. (REK)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Whitestone Anthem Marketplace LLC. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16057070. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-3236-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Teresa J Beahm. (Morey, Lorraine) (KEP)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16057070 filed by Teresa J Beahm. (Morey, Lorraine) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beahm v. Whitestone Anthem Marketplace LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa J Beahm
Represented By: Lorraine Morey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitestone Anthem Marketplace LLC
Represented By: Patrick Charles Gorman
Represented By: Donald L Myles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?