Dishman v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Linda Dishman
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Costco Wholesale Corporation and Costco Wholesale Membership Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv03250
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-18-3250-PHX-SMB. Any deadlines and/or hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Dispositive motions due by 3/13/2020. (See attached Order for additional details and deadlines). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/27/18. (JAMA)
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Scheduling Conference held on 11/27/2018. Deadlines discussed and entered. Scheduling Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Edward Ladley for Plaintiff. Karen Stafford for Defendants. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 2:02 PM to 2:25 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Linda Dishman. (Fawber, Brian)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Meyer, Cassandra)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Linda Dishman. (Fawber, Brian)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/23/18. (JAMA)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Meyer, Cassandra)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/15/18. (JAMA)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16059738. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-03250-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
October 10, 2018 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Demand for Jury Trial, Civil Case Cover Sheet(original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court) on 9/18/18), upon Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Membership Incorporated on 9/26/18.(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Costco Wholesale Membership Incorporated, Unknown Parties(named as John and Jane Does 1-5), Unknown Parties(named as ABC Corporations 5-10). (Meyer, Cassandra) (BAC)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-011347. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16059738 filed by Unknown Parties(named as John and Jane Does 1-5), Costco Wholesale Membership Incorporated, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Unknown Parties(named as ABC Corporations 5-10). (Meyer, Cassandra) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Exhibit Notice to Plaintiff, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dishman v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Dishman
Represented By: Edward Michael Ladley
Represented By: Mark Paul Breyer
Represented By: Brian Christopher Fawber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Membership Incorporated
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Represented By: Karen Christine Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?