Curtis v. Microsoft et al
Plaintiff: Adam Josiah Curtis
Defendant: Epic Games Incorporated, Microsoft, Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated, Quentin Clark and Patrick Clark
Case Number: 2:2018cv03291
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff having failed to comply with the Court's order to re-file his Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, this action is hereby terminated. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/28/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE (Titled: Testificate of Foul Play) by Adam Josiah Curtis. (REK)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's #7 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not re-file a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs or pay the case opening fee on or before November 21, 2018, the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action without prejudice and without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/7/2018. (LFIG)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSIVE DECLARATION re: #6 Order by Plaintiff Adam Josiah Curtis. (REK)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Adam Josiah Curtis. (REK)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Application #2 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff may refile a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs or in the alternative pay the case opening fee on or before November 1, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not refile a completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs or pay the case opening fee on or before November 1, 2018, the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action without prejudice and without further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/18/2018. (REK)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAS)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-cv-03291-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Adam Josiah Curtis. (BAS)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Adam Josiah Curtis.(BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. Microsoft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blizzard Entertainment Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quentin Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Josiah Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?