Leucadia Air LLC v. Bombardier Aerospace Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Leucadia Air LLC
Defendant: Bombardier Aerospace Corporation and Uknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2018cv03536
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re: #25 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Allin, Taylor)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER (text only): IT IS ORDERED that in responding to the motion to remand (Doc. #25 ), Defendant must address the citizenship of all parties. Specifically, Defendant must state the citizenship of all members of the LLC, not the managers. (See Doc. #15 ). Counsel for Defendant must also certify that they have each read Johnson v. Columbia Properties Anchorage, L.P., 437 F.3d 894 (9th Cir. 2006). Ordered by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 12/6/2018. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
December 4, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Leucadia Air LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Remand)(Hatch, Brian)
December 4, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leucadia Air LLC. (Hatch, Brian)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERNCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge James A. Teilborg. (See attached order for additional information.) Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 12/4/2018. (RMW)
December 4, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (DXD)
December 3, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation.(Allin, Taylor)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #19 the second stipulation for extension of time to answer. (See attached order for further details.) Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 11/30/2018. (RMW)
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 *STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer Responsive Pleading (Second Request) by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Allin, Taylor) *Modified to correct event on 11/29/2018 (REK).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Plaintiff file its Corporate Disclosure Statement not later than ten (10) business days. In addition to the information required by F.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and LRCiv. 7.1.1, the Disclosure Statement shall also contain a list of each member of each LLC. Failure to file the Corporate Disclosure Statement and a list of the members of the LLCs shall result in sanctions being imposed. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/20/2018. (REK)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Doc. #13 ), and granting a one-time extension of time until 12/3/2018 for Defendant Bombardier Aerospace Corporation to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff Leucadia Air, LLC's complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. Pursuant to Doc. #3 , at 5, 5(b), NO further extensions will be granted. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 11/13/2018. (RMW)
November 9, 2018 Filing 16 *SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal Alleging Federal Subject Matter Jurisdiction pursuant to: #15 Order by Defendant Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Errata Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Allin, Taylor) *Modified text on 11/13/2018 (REK).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that by November 9, 2018, Defendant shall file a supplement to the notice of removal fully alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction or this case will be remanded to state court [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/2/18. (MAW)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, because the motion for extension of time (Doc. #13 ) fails to comply with Local Rule 7.3(b), Plaintiff shall respond to the motion by November 8, 2018. Ordered by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/2/18. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Allin, Taylor)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Bombardier Corporation for Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Allin, Taylor) *Modified to correct corporate parent on 10/31/2018 (REK).
October 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. PLEASE USE THE FORM PROVIDED. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Leucadia Air LLC. (KEP)
October 30, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. PLEASE USE THE FORM PROVIDED. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (KEP)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Bombardier Aerospace Corporation for Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Allin, Taylor)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Allin, Taylor)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that that the parties must comply with Gen. Ord. No. 17-08 (D. Ariz. Apr. 14, 2017) regarding the mandatory initial discovery responses [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/26/18. (MAW)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. Corporate Disclosure Statement. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit Corporate Disclosure. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. Supplemental Cover Sheet. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16121842. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-03536-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
October 25, 2018 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Service of Process re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate upon Bombardier Aerospace Corporation on 9/25/18 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 9/24/18).(BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-050627. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16121842 filed by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Allin, Taylor) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leucadia Air LLC v. Bombardier Aerospace Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leucadia Air LLC
Represented By: Brian A Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Aerospace Corporation
Represented By: Taylor H Allin
Represented By: Brian Thomas DelGatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?