Flowers-Carter et al v. Braun Corporation
Plaintiff: Latricia Flowers-Carter and Douglas Carter
Defendant: Braun Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv03836
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Braun Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arthur, Cameron)
December 28, 2018 Filing 21 First Amended ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Braun Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I)(Arthur, Cameron)
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Braun Corporation First Amended Answer to Plantiffs' First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Arthur, Cameron)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' Request for Settlement Conference (Doc. #18 ). Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns having been randomly drawn, IT IS ORDERED referring this matter to Magistrate Judge Burns for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Counsel are directed to contact said chambers within 14 days of the date of this Order to schedule a hearing date and time. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/18/18. (MAW)
December 17, 2018 Filing 18 REQUEST re: for Settlement Conference by Plaintiffs Douglas Carter, Latricia Flowers-Carter. (Thompson, Russell)
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Braun Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Arthur, Cameron)
December 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Service of Preliminary Order by Douglas Carter, Latricia Flowers-Carter re: #11 Order . (Thompson, Russell)
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Braun Corporation. (Arthur, Cameron)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: An amended complaint (Doc. #13 ) having been filed, IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #8 ) is denied as moot, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/11/18. (MAW)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Braun Corporation filed by Latricia Flowers-Carter, Douglas Carter.(Thompson, Russell)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Douglas Carter, Latricia Flowers-Carter . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Redlined amended complaint)(Thompson, Russell)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Parties' Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #9 ) and extending Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to December 10, 2018. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/21/18. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Extension of Time to Respond by Douglas Carter, Latricia Flowers-Carter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Russell)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Braun Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Arthur, Cameron)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 *Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by Braun Corporation. (Arthur, Cameron) *Modified to reflect "amended" on 11/7/2018 (REK).
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. PLEASE use the attached form. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Braun Corporation. (MCO)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Braun Corporation. (MCO)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16161553. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-03836-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Braun Corporation. (Arthur, Cameron) (MCO)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-098166. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16161553 filed by Braun Corporation. (Arthur, Cameron) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers-Carter et al v. Braun Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latricia Flowers-Carter
Represented By: Jose F Gill
Represented By: Russell Snow Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Carter
Represented By: Jose F Gill
Represented By: Russell Snow Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braun Corporation
Represented By: William Francis Auther
Represented By: Cameron Aaron Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?