International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers v. Navopache Electric Cooperative Incorporated
Plaintiff: Local 387 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Defendant: Navopache Electric Cooperative Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv04108
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton: Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2019. Argument held. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement Plaintiff's Petition to Compel Arbitration (Doc. #1 ). APPEARANCES: Gerald Barrett for Plaintiff. John Doran and Patrick Scully for Defendant. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams) Hearing held 1:01 PM to 1:27 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
January 3, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE re: Notice of Filing Executed Declaration by Local 387 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers . (Barrett, Gerald)
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #7 MOTION Request for Entry of Briefing Schedule filed by Local 387 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-11, #2 Declaration of David Vandever)(Barrett, Gerald)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project shall be held in abeyance in this case pending the Court's consideration of the parties' expedited briefing and oral argument concerning the Petition to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/17/18. (MAW)
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION Stipulated Motion to Delay Mandatory Initial Discovery by Navopache Electric Cooperative Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doran, John)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's reply brief shall be due December 21, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/13/18. (MAW)
December 13, 2018 Remark: Pro Hac Vice Motion granted for Joseph H Hunt on behalf of Navopache Electric Cooperative, Inc. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MSA)
December 12, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Patrick R Scully on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 12, 2018 Filing 16 *MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief by Local 387 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barrett, Gerald) *Modified to correct event and term additional events; attorney noticed on 12/12/2018 (SLQ).
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE BRIEF by Navopache Electric Cooperative Incorporated re #1 Complaint Brief in Opposition to Petition to Compel Arbitration. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Charles Moore, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Doran, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navopache Electric Cooperative Incorporated. (Doran, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Navopache Electric Cooperative Incorporated.(Doran, John)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John Alan Doran on behalf of Navopache Electric Cooperative Incorporated. (Doran, John)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER: On Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Briefing Schedule (Doc. #7 ), and for good cause shown therein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant within 21 days of its receipt of service of the Petition shall file a written response stating any reasons as to why the Court should not find in Plaintiff's favor and order the Defendant to proceed to Arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant files a written response, Plaintiff shall within 10 days of receipt thereof file its written reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on this matter on January 14, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/3/18. (MAW)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 *AMENDED by Doc. #11 * ORDER: On Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Briefing Schedule (Doc. #7 ), and for good cause shown therein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant within 21 days of its receipt of service of the Petition shall file a written response stating any reasons as to why the Court should not find in Plaintiff's favor and order the Defendant to proceed to Arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant files a written response, Plaintiff shall within 10 days of receipt thereof file its written reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will hear oral argument on this matter on January 14, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/3/18. (MAW) Modified on 12/3/2018 to reflect oral argument is set in 2019 (MAW).
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Local 387 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Petition to Compel Arbitration, Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice to Parties, Request for Entry of Briefing Schedule, Proposed Order upon Navopache Electric Cooperative, Inc. on 11/20/2018. (Barrett, Gerald)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/19/18. (MAW)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION Request for Entry of Briefing Schedule by Local 387 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barrett, Gerald)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Navopache Electric Cooperative Incorporated. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16209521. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-4108-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Local 387 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Barrett, Gerald) (KEP)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Local 387 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Barrett, Gerald) (KEP)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT / Petition to Compel Arbitration. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16209521 filed by Local 387 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Barrett, Gerald) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers v. Navopache Electric Cooperative Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 387 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Represented By: Gerald Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navopache Electric Cooperative Incorporated
Represented By: Patrick R Scully
Represented By: Joseph H Hunt
Represented By: John Alan Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?