Carman v. Hubbard Broadcasting Incorporated

Plaintiff: Joey Carman
Defendant: Hubbard Broadcasting Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2018cv04195
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Referring Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part Defendant's #21 Motion Regarding Impending Settlement. A Stipulation to Dismiss shall be filed on or before Friday, March 1, 2019. If a Stipulation to Dismiss has not been filed by this deadline, then the parties shall file a Status Report to the Court on that date. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/21/18. (MSA)
December 19, 2018 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines for 30 days or Extend Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Hubbard Broadcasting Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting a 30-Day Stay, #2 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond)(Bodney, David)
December 7, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee. All future documents filed shall reflect the revised case number of CV-18-4195-PHX-SMM. Any deadlines and/or hearings are AFFIRMED unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF)
November 29, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Thomas B Sullivan on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRELIMINARY ORDER [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/27/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
November 26, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MAP)
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (MAP)
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 Letter Re Transfer of 4:18-cv-1429-RWS from the Eastern District of Missouri to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-18-4195-PHX-DWL. (MAP)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-01429 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion for extension of time to file a responsive pleading #13 -2 is granted, and defendant shall have up to and including December 21, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the motion to transfer #13 -1 is granted, and this action is transferred to the District of Arizona. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/21/18. (ARL) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bodney, David) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc. (Bodney, David) filed by Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/17/18. (KEK) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bodney, David) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Bodney. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6787496) by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bodney, David) filed by Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/2/2018. (NEP) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Bodney. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6787496) by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Bodney, David) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Sullivan, Thomas) filed by Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/17/18. (ARL) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Sullivan, Thomas) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas Byrne Sullivan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6752591) by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Sullivan, Thomas) filed by Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/14/18. (ARL) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Sullivan, Thomas) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas Byrne Sullivan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6752591) by Defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. (Sullivan, Thomas) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc.. The summons was emailed to attorney Richard Paul Liebowitz. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Joey Carman Process Server: Missouri Process Serving, LLC (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. Summons to issue when Notice of Process Server and Origianl Filing Form are filed. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Hubbard Broadcasting, Inc. with receipt number 0865-6718459, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Joey Carman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from moed on 11/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carman v. Hubbard Broadcasting Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbard Broadcasting Incorporated
Represented By: David Jeremy Bodney
Represented By: Thomas Byrne Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Carman
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?