Emerald Equities LLC v. Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC et al
Appellant: Emerald Equities LLC
Appellee: ROI Properties LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Bruce Gray, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, CPF Vaseo Associates LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, East of Epicenter LLC and ROI Properties LLC Liquidating Trusee of the May Liquidating Trust and the July Liquidating Trust and sole manager of the consolidated Estates of the May Debtors and July Debtors doing business as ROI Properties Incorporated
Not Classified By Court: Arizona State Land Department, Thomas Title & Escrow, Abrams Capital Partners II LP, Maricopa County Treasurer, Abrams Capital Partners I LP, Joseph E Meyer, Jr., Abrams Capital LLC, Desert Ridge Community Association, BV Lending LLC, Abrams Capital Management LP, Constantino Flores, Stuart S Bingham, Abrams Capital Management LLC, Bruce W Gray, Lisa Ann Zurcher-Meyer, Swiss Desert LLC, J.E. Meyer Investments Incorporated and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Trustee: United States Trustees Office
Case Number: 2:2018cv04467
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief, #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Briefs filed by Emerald Equities LLC. (Cleary, David)
February 1, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing) filed by East of Epicenter LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC. (McGrath, Michael)
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing) filed by East of Epicenter LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC. (McGrath, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Brief by ROI Properties LLC. (Hilkert, Paul)
January 29, 2019 Filing 23 *MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Briefs as to #14 Order by East of Epicenter LLC, Bruce Gray, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC. (Simpson, Christopher) *Modified to correct motion type and remove duplicative motion on 1/30/2019 (REK).
January 28, 2019 Filing 22 *MOTION TO DISMISS CASE, Joinder re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing) by Appellee ROI Properties LLC. (Rodgers, Stuart) *Modified to change to a motion on 1/29/2019 (REK).
January 25, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing) filed by Emerald Equities LLC. (Cleary, David)
January 25, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing) // Response Of CPF Vaseo Associates, LLC To Appellees Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Standing filed by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (Weber, Lindsi)
January 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #18 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening filed by Emerald Equities LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
January 24, 2019 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF by Emerald Equities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume I, #2 Appendix Volume II)(Cleary, David)
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC re: #16 Brief - Opening // Appendix to CPF Vaseo Associates, LLCs Opening Brief On Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Tab 1, #2 Appendix Tab 2, #3 Appendix Tab 3, #4 Appendix Tab 4, #5 Appendix Tab 5, #6 Appendix Tab 6, #7 Appendix Tab 7, #8 Appendix Tab 8, #9 Appendix Tab 9, #10 Appendix Tab 10, #11 Appendix Tab 11, #12 Appendix Tab 12, #13 Appendix Tab 13, #14 Appendix Tab 14, #15 Appendix Tab 15, #16 Appendix Tab 16, #17 Appendix Tab 17, #18 Appendix Tab 18, #19 Appendix Tab 19, #20 Appendix Tab 20, #21 Appendix Tab 21, #22 Appendix Tab 22, #23 Appendix Tab 23, #24 Appendix Tab 24, #25 Appendix Tab 25, #26 Appendix Tab 26, #27 Appendix Tab 27, #28 Appendix Tab 28, #29 Appendix Tab 29, #30 Appendix Tab 30, #31 Appendix Tab 31, #32 Appendix Tab 32, #33 Appendix Tab 33, #34 Appendix Tab 34, #35 Appendix Tab 35, #36 Appendix Tab 36, #37 Appendix Tab 37, #38 Appendix Tab 38, #39 Appendix Tab 39)(Burgess, Todd)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 OPENING BRIEF by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC // CPF Vaseo Associates, LLCs Opening Brief On Appeal. (Burgess, Todd)
January 24, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Kevin D Finger on behalf of Emerald Equities LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appellees' Motion To Dismiss Appeal As Moot And For Lack Of Appellate Standing) by East of Epicenter LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Bruce Gray, Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simpson, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER - Appellant(s) shall serve and file an Opening Brief with the Clerk of Court for the United States District Court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Appellee(s) shall serve and file a Responsive Brief with the Clerk of Court for the United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days after service of the Appellant(s) brief. Appellant(s) may serve and file a Reply with the Clerk of Court for the United States District Court, within seven (7) days after service of the Appellee(s) brief. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/10/19. (LAD)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CPF Vaseo Associates LLC. (Burgess, Todd)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC, #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by East of Epicenter LLC, #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC. (Cali, Anthony)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by East of Epicenter LLC. (Cali, Anthony)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC. (Cali, Anthony)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court by East of Epicenter LLC, Bruce Gray, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC. (GMP)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emerald Equities LLC. (Cleary, David)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROI Properties LLC. (Rodgers, Stuart)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bruce Gray, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC. (Stuart, John)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Abrams Capital LLC, Abrams Capital Management LLC, Abrams Capital Management LP, Abrams Capital Partners I LP, Abrams Capital Partners II LP, BV Lending LLC, CPF Vaseo Associates LLC, Desert Ridge Community Association, East of Epicenter LLC, Emerald Equities LLC, Epicenter Partners LLC, Constantino Flores (as Chapter 7 Trustee for the bankruptcy estate of GDG Partners LLC), Gray Meyer Fannin LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC, Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC, J.E. Meyer Investments Incorporated, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, ROI Properties LLC, Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC, Swiss Desert LLC, Thomas Title & Escrow. (REK)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerald Equities LLC v. Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Emerald Equities LLC
Represented By: David Dennis Cleary
Represented By: Kevin D Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ROI Properties LLC
Represented By: William John Quinlan
Represented By: Paul Michael Hilkert
Represented By: Stuart B Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sonoran Desert Land Investors LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Represented By: Anthony P Cali
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Epicenter Partners LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Represented By: Anthony P Cali
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bruce Gray
Represented By: John Neil Stuart
Represented By: Daniel G Dowd
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Moyer
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge II LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Represented By: Anthony P Cali
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gray Meyer Fannin LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Represented By: Anthony P Cali
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CPF Vaseo Associates LLC
Represented By: Todd Andrew Burgess
Represented By: Lindsi Michelle Weber
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gray Phoenix Desert Ridge I LLC
Represented By: John Neil Stuart
Represented By: Daniel G Dowd
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Moyer
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: East of Epicenter LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Salerno
Represented By: David Jeffrey Hindman
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Christopher Charles Simpson
Represented By: Alisa Carol Lacey
Represented By: Anthony P Cali
Represented By: Frederick Jay Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ROI Properties LLC Liquidating Trusee of the May Liquidating Trust and the July Liquidating Trust and sole manager of the consolidated Estates of the May Debtors and July Debtors doing business as ROI Properties Incorporated
Represented By: William John Quinlan
Represented By: Paul Michael Hilkert
Represented By: Stuart B Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Arizona State Land Department
Represented By: Dean Christian Waldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Thomas Title & Escrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Abrams Capital Partners II LP
Represented By: Marvin Christopher Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Maricopa County Treasurer
Represented By: Klaus Peter Muthig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Abrams Capital Partners I LP
Represented By: Marvin Christopher Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Joseph E Meyer, Jr.
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Represented By: John Matthew Derstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Abrams Capital LLC
Represented By: Marvin Christopher Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Desert Ridge Community Association
Represented By: Michael Walter Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: BV Lending LLC
Represented By: Vincent P Slusher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Abrams Capital Management LP
Represented By: Marvin Christopher Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Constantino Flores
Represented By: Dawn Marie Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Stuart S Bingham
Represented By: Joseph M Vanleuven
Represented By: Neal Hait Bookspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Abrams Capital Management LLC
Represented By: Marvin Christopher Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Bruce W Gray
Represented By: James E Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lisa Ann Zurcher-Meyer
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Represented By: John Matthew Derstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Swiss Desert LLC
Represented By: Dale C Schian
Represented By: Scott Robert Goldberg
Represented By: Grant L Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: J.E. Meyer Investments Incorporated
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Represented By: John Matthew Derstine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Patrick A Clisham
Represented By: Scott B Cohen
Represented By: Steven N Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustees Office
Represented By: Edward Kenneth Bernatavicius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?