Hesselbacher v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Matthew Hesselbacher
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv04777
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, presently set for 3/15/2019 at 9:00 AM is VACATED and RESET. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference reset for 3/14/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes. (MMO)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses filed by Plaintiff Matthew Hesselbacher. (Shumway, G)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Gallardo, Kristine)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/4/2019. (MMO)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 *Defendant Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Gallardo, Kristine) *Modified text to remove jury demand on 1/4/2019 (REK).
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Ford Motor Company filed by Matthew Hesselbacher.(Shumway, G)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Notice of Filing First Amended Complaint by Matthew Hesselbacher . (Shumway, G)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Amended Notice of Removal by Ford Motor Company re: #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Gallardo, Kristine)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall file under seal the Notice of Removal (Doc. 1). FURTHER ORDERED that, by no later than 12/27/2018, Defendants shall file an amended Notice of Removal that redacts all references to the minor(s) in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3). FURTHER ORDERED that, by no later than 12/27/2018, Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint that redacts all references to the minor(s) in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a)(3). Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/19/2018. (MMO)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16328348. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-04777-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Gallardo, Kristine) (MCO)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 *NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number cv2018-014052. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16328348 filed by Ford Motor Company. (Gallardo, Kristine) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(MCO) *Modified to seal pursuant to document #5 on 12/19/2018 (SLQ).
December 19, 2018 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons/Complaint/Certificate of Arbitration/Demand for Jury Trial upon Ford Motor Company c/o CT Corporate System, state agent on 11/20/2018. (MCO) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hesselbacher v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hesselbacher
Represented By: Thomas M Ryan
Represented By: Brent Michael Ghelfi
Represented By: G Lynn Shumway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Craig Aaron Logsdon
Represented By: Kristine Lucille Gallardo
Represented By: Patrick Xavier Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?