American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al

Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv04821
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Having reviewed the government's "Notice of Resumed Government Activity" (Doc. #10 ), IT IS ORDERED denying the government's previously-filed "Motion for Stay of Case Due to Federal Government Shutdown" (Doc. #8 ) as moot. As discussed in the notice, the parties may, after meeting and conferring, submit a new proposed schedule. Until such a schedule is submitted and approved, however, the deadlines in the current scheduling order (Doc. #5 ) remain valid. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 2/1/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Resumed Government Activity by Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re: #8 MOTION to Stay Due to Federal Government Shutdown . (Morrison, Kristina)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Kristina L. Morrison appearing for Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Attorney Peter Michael Lantka terminated. . (Morrison, Kristina)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Due to Federal Government Shutdown by Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lantka, Peter)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant(s) shall serve an answer or otherwise plead within thirty (30) days after service, unless the Court otherwise directs for good cause shown. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for filing dispositive motions is four (4) months from the date the case is at issue [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/21/18. (MAW)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16332040. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-04821-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona. (Wulkan, Lawrence)(BAR) Modified on 12/20/2018 (BAR).
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16332040 filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona. (Wulkan, Lawrence) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Arizona
Represented By: Lawrence J Wulkan
Represented By: David Craig Onuschak, II
Represented By: William Bradford Peard
Represented By: Javier Torres
Represented By: Kathleen E Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Peter Michael Lantka
Represented By: Kristina Louise Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Peter Michael Lantka
Represented By: Kristina Louise Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?