ABC Water LLC v. APlus Water LLC
Plaintiff: ABC Water LLC
Defendant: APlus Water LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv04851
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ABC Water LLC. (Jones, Jacob)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by APlus Water LLC. (Lila, Ben)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by APlus Water LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lila, Ben)
January 18, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Ben T Lila on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by ABC Water LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Notice to Parties - Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, Preliminary Order upon APlus Water, LLC on January 10, 2019. (Jones, Jacob)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY ORDER: Plaintiff must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than March 20, 2019. Plaintiff must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachmentson Defendant and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on March 20, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The parties must exchange MIDP Responses and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court no later than thirty (30) days after the first responsive pleading (an answer, counterclaim, crossclaim, and/or reply) is filed. Supplemental MIDP Responses shall be served on the opposing party no later than thirty (30) days after the information is discovered or revealed. The parties must produce to the opposing party the electronically stored information identified in the MIDP Responses no later than forty (40) days after the MIDP Responses have been served. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/21/2018. (REK)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court will not consider a TRO request embedded in the Complaint. Plaintiff must file a motion for a TRO consistent with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/20/2018. (LMR)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to APlus Water LLC. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by ABC Water LLC. (Jones, Jacob) (MFR)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (MFR)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16336762. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-4851-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by ABC Water LLC. (Jones, Jacob)(MFR)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABC Water LLC. (Jones, Jacob) (MFR)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16336762 filed by ABC Water LLC. (Jones, Jacob) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3-14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16-28)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC Water LLC v. APlus Water LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Water LLC
Represented By: David Gary Barker
Represented By: David E Rogers
Represented By: Jacob Christensen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APlus Water LLC
Represented By: Ben T Lila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?