Vickrey et al v. United States of America
Petitioner: Donn J Vickrey and Kim L Vickrey
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018mc00051
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action in its entirety. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/22/2018. (LFIG)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action filed by Kim L Vickrey, Donn J Vickrey. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Donn J Vickrey, Kim L Vickrey. (Kaczmarek, Derek)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Miscellaneous Case Opening filed by Kim L Vickrey, Donn J Vickrey. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Kim L Vickrey, Donn J Vickrey. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC) *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Donn J Vickrey, Kim L Vickrey. (Cahill, John) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16012445. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 2:MC-18-00051-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 *Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Motion/Petition to Quash IRS Summons - 26 U.S.C. 7609(b)(2). Case Opening Fee Received: $ 47.00 receipt number 0970-16012445 filed by Donn J Vickrey, Kim L Vickrey. (Cahill, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(DLC) *Modified on 9/28/2018 to Seal Exhibit 1 Pursuant to DJH Chambers (MAP)*.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vickrey et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donn J Vickrey
Represented By: Derek W Kaczmarek
Represented By: John Gregory Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kim L Vickrey
Represented By: Derek W Kaczmarek
Represented By: John Gregory Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?