Aguila Management LLC v. International Fruit Genetics LLC

Plaintiff: Aguila Management LLC
Defendant: International Fruit Genetics LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00173
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. A motion to dismiss (Doc. #20 ) has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes, then the party who filed the above document (Doc. 30 ), must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (LFIG)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by International Fruit Genetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Bruno, Leah)
February 6, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Leah Bruno and Carol Anne Been on behalf of defendants. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 6, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Kate E Hart on behalf of defendant. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 6, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Timothy M McCarthy on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 4, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for David J Marr on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting a one-time extension of time until 3/7/2019 for Defendant to respond to the complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/31/2019. (LFIG)
January 31, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by International Fruit Genetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stanley, Andrew)
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Fruit Genetics LLC. (Stanley, Andrew)
January 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Carl Stanley on behalf of International Fruit Genetics LLC. (Stanley, Andrew)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia Ann Ricketts on behalf of International Fruit Genetics LLC. (Ricketts, Cynthia)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 3/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/17/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE re: of Service of Order re Rule 12(b) by Aguila Management LLC re: #8 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Carroll, Sean)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Aguila Management LLC : Certificate of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon International Fruit Genetics, LLC on 1/15/2019. (Carroll, Sean)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to International Fruit Genetics LLC. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Aguila Management LLC. (Carroll, Sean)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Aguila Management LLC. (Carroll, Sean)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/10/2019. (LFIG)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to International Fruit Genetics LLC. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading, Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (Attachments: #1 AO121)(MCO)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16396041. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-173-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Aguila Management LLC. (Carroll, Sean) (MCO)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aguila Management LLC. (Carroll, Sean) (MCO)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16396041 filed by Aguila Management LLC. (Carroll, Sean) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguila Management LLC v. International Fruit Genetics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aguila Management LLC
Represented By: Sean Michael Carroll
Represented By: Ryan James Lorenz
Represented By: Timothy M McCarthy
Represented By: David J Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Fruit Genetics LLC
Represented By: Leah R Bruno
Represented By: Andrew Carl Stanley
Represented By: Kate E Hart
Represented By: Carol Anne Been
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?