Brandt Engineers Group Limited v. Roberts et al

Plaintiff: Brandt Engineers Group Limited
Defendant: Unknown Knutson, Roberts Resorts Limited, OJD Engineering LP, OJD Management LLC, West Amarillo MHC LLC, Scott Roberts, Advanced Pavement Maintenance Limited, Unknown Harkin, Lakeside Paving Materials LLC, Unknown Braudt, Unknown Roberts, Unknown Shadle, Amarillo MHC Limited, Marcus Che Shadle, Glenn E Braudt, Chad Harkin, Larry S Knutson and Amarillo MHC LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00231
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Venue by Amarillo MHC LLC, Chad Harkin, Unknown Harkin, Scott Roberts, West Amarillo MHC LLC . (Williams, James)
March 7, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Amarillo MHC LLC, Chad Harkin, Unknown Harkin, Scott Roberts, West Amarillo MHC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, James)
March 7, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by James Lawrence Williams on behalf of Amarillo MHC LLC, Scott Roberts, West Amarillo MHC LLC. (Williams, James)
March 7, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by James Lawrence Williams on behalf of Chad Harkin, Unknown Harkin. (Williams, James)
March 7, 2019 Filing 37 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: Proof of Service re: Complaint Package personally served upon Marcus and Jane Doe Shadle on 02-04-2019. (Mableson, Connie)
March 6, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Unknown Shadle, OJD Management LLC, OJD Engineering LP, Marcus Che Shadle, #35 Response to Motion filed by Unknown Shadle, OJD Management LLC, OJD Engineering LP, Marcus Che Shadle, #33 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Unknown Shadle, OJD Management LLC, OJD Engineering LP, Marcus Che Shadle. Documents not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
March 6, 2019 Filing 35 * RESPONSE to Motion re: #28 Consent MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas, Amarillo Unopposed Motion to Change Venue filed by OJD Engineering LP, OJD Management LLC, Marcus Che Shadle, Unknown Shadle. (Everroad, Andrew) * Document not in compliance with Local Rule; attorney noticed on 3/7/2019 (LAD).
March 6, 2019 Filing 34 * MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint by OJD Engineering LP, OJD Management LLC, Marcus Che Shadle, Unknown Shadle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Everroad, Andrew) * Document in violation of Local Rule; attorney noticed on 3/7/2019 (LAD).
March 6, 2019 Filing 33 * NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Q Everroad on behalf of OJD Engineering LP, OJD Management LLC, Marcus Che Shadle, Unknown Shadle. (Everroad, Andrew) * Document not in compliance with Local Rule; attorney noticed on 3/7/2019 (LAD).
March 2, 2019 Filing 32 * DECLARATION of Connie J. Mableson, attorney for Plaintiff re: Compliance with Court Order (Doc. #31 ) by Plaintiff Brandt Engineers Group Limited. (Mableson, Connie) * Modified to add document linkage on 3/4/2019 (LAD).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer re Roberts' Defendants and OJDs Defendants #30 . Plaintiff shall provide a copy of the Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue #28 and this Order upon Defendants. Defendants may file a request for an extension of time to answer the Complaint #1 within 15 days of the date of this Order. Defendants may file any objection to the Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue #28 within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/26/2019. (REK)
February 25, 2019 Filing 30 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Brandt Engineers Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Extending Time to Answer)(Mableson, Connie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #28 Consent MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas, Amarillo Unopposed Motion to Change Venue filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited, #26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited, #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
February 20, 2019 Filing 28 Consent MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas, Amarillo Unopposed Motion to Change Venue by Brandt Engineers Group Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mableson, Connie)
February 20, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Brandt Engineers Group Limited. Party Unknown Roberts (named as Jane Doe) terminated. (Mableson, Connie)
February 20, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Brandt Engineers Group Limited. Party Roberts Resorts Limited terminated. (Mableson, Connie)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the Defendants listed above shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 no later than February 25, 2019. See document for further details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/13/2019. (REK)
February 9, 2019 Filing 24 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: Proof of Service re: Complaint Package Complaint, Summons, Order re: meet and confer, Notice to Parties MIDPP, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Roberts Resorts, Ltd. on 02-04-2019. (Mableson, Connie)
February 9, 2019 Filing 23 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint Package Complaint, Summons, Order re: meet and confer, Notice to Parties MIDPP, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Chad Harkin on 2/04/2019. (Mableson, Connie) *Modified to correct service date on 2/11/2019 (REK).
February 9, 2019 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint Package Complaint, Summons, Order re: meet and confer, Notice to Parties MIDPP, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon West Amarillo MHC, LLC on 01-28-2019. (Mableson, Connie)
February 9, 2019 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint Package Complaint, Summons, Order re: meet and confer, Notice to Parties MIDPP, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Amarillo MHC, LLC on 01-28-2019. (Mableson, Connie)
February 9, 2019 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: Proof of Service re: Complaint Package Complaint, Summons, Order re: meet and confer, Notice to Parties MIDPP, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Advanced Pavement Maintenance, Ltd. on 01-30-2019. (Mableson, Connie)
February 9, 2019 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: re: Complaint Package Complaint, Summons, Order re: meet and confer, Notice to Parties MIDPP, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Larry Knutson & Lisa Knutson on 01-30-2019. (Mableson, Connie)
February 9, 2019 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: Proof of Service re: Complaint Package Complaint, Summons, Order re: meet and confer, Notice to Parties MIDPP, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon OJD Engineering, LP on 01-30-2019. (Mableson, Connie)
February 9, 2019 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: Proof of Service re: Complaint Package Complaint, Summons, Order re: meet and confer, Notice to Parties MIDPP, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon OJD Management, LLC on 01-30.2019. (Mableson, Connie)
February 9, 2019 Filing 16 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: Proof of Service re: Complaint Package Complaint, Summons, Order re: meet and confer, Notice to Parties MIDPP, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Glen Braudt and Unknown Braudt on 1-30-2019. (Mableson, Connie) *Modified to add additional party served on 2/11/2019 (REK).
February 9, 2019 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: Proof of Service re: Complaint Package Complaint, Summons, Order re: meet and confer, Notice to Parties MIDPP, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Lakeside Paving Materials, LLC on 01-30-2019. (Mableson, Connie)
February 9, 2019 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited: Proof of Service re: Complaint Package Complaint, Summons, Order re: meet and confer, Notice to Parties- MIDPP, Civil Cover Sheet, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice Re; Magistrate upon Scott Roberts on 01/18/2019. (Mableson, Connie)
February 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Extension of Time to Answer by Brandt Engineers Group Limited . (Mableson, Connie)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited. (Mableson, Connie)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 12, 2019. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/15/19. (JAMA)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/15/19. (JAMA)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO121)(BAC)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 *Summons Issued as to Scott Roberts and Jane Doe Roberts, Amarillo MHC, LLC, West Amarillo MHC, LLC, Roberts Resorts, Ltd, OJD Engineering, LP, OJD Management, LLC, Marcus Che Shadle and Jane Doe Shadle, Advanced Pavement Maintenance, Ltd, Lakeside Paving Materials, LLC, Glen E. Braudt and Jane Doe Braudt, Larry Scott Knutson and Jane Doe Knutson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(BAC) *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. *Modified to correct event type on 1/15/2019 (BAC).
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16404560. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00231-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brandt Engineers Group Limited. (Mableson, Connie) (BAC)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Brandt Engineers Group Limited. (Mableson, Connie) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(BAC)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-16404560 filed by Brandt Engineers Group Limited. (Mableson, Connie) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandt Engineers Group Limited v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Resorts Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OJD Engineering LP
Represented By: Andrew Q Everroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OJD Management LLC
Represented By: Andrew Q Everroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Amarillo MHC LLC
Represented By: James Lawrence Williams
Represented By: Esther Linkey Sivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Roberts
Represented By: James Lawrence Williams
Represented By: Esther Linkey Sivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Pavement Maintenance Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Harkin
Represented By: James Lawrence Williams
Represented By: Esther Linkey Sivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeside Paving Materials LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Braudt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Shadle
Represented By: Andrew Q Everroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarillo MHC Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Che Shadle
Represented By: Andrew Q Everroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn E Braudt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Harkin
Represented By: James Lawrence Williams
Represented By: Esther Linkey Sivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry S Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amarillo MHC LLC
Represented By: James Lawrence Williams
Represented By: Esther Linkey Sivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandt Engineers Group Limited
Represented By: Connie Jo Mableson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?